Cherry v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Andrew Cherry
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00027
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Shelley Renee Hebert for Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America (McFarland, Helen)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(McFarland, Helen)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ian H Morrison for Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Helen McFarland on behalf of Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America. (McFarland, Helen)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shelley Herbert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6939333 (McFarland, Helen)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ian Morrison FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6939322 (McFarland, Helen)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/23/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/9/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/16/2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
January 28, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #4 Waiver of Service : edited text to correct date waiver was mailed to Defendant from 1/27/201 to 1/8/2021. (PM)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America mailed on 1/27/2021 1/8/2021 (Cowell, Jesse) Modified on 1/28/2021 to correct date waiver was mailed to Defendant (PM).
January 11, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Appearance : Added correct names of attorneys named in the Notice of Appearance to docket text. (RE)
January 11, 2021 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jesse Cowell R. Darrin Class on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Cherry. (Cowell, Jesse) Modified on 1/11/2021 to correct attorney's name. (RE)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jesse Cowell Chris Roy on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Cherry. (Cowell, Jesse) Modified on 1/11/2021 to add correct attorney. (RE)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Prudential Insurance Company of America (Receipt # AWAWDC-6860088) Attorney Jesse Cowell added to party Andrew Cherry(pty:pla), filed by Andrew Cherry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cowell, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherry v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Cherry
Represented By: Jesse Cowell
Represented By: Christopher E Roy
Represented By: R Darrin Class
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Ian H Morrison
Represented By: Helen McFarland
Represented By: Shelley Renee Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?