Demos v. Pence et al
Plaintiff: John Robert Demos, Jr
Defendant: Mitch McConnell, Chuck Schumer, Nancy Pelosi, Kevin McCarthy and Mike Pence
Case Number: 2:2021cv00109
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 JUDGMENT BY COURT. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(KMC)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Objections, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Plaintiff's #1 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is DENIED and the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and (e). **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(KMC)
February 13, 2021 Filing 3 OBJECTIONS, filed by Plaintiff John Robert Demos, Jr to #2 Report and Recommendation. Noting Date: 3/5/2021. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(SP)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Theresa L Fricke re #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. Noted for 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(KMC)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 PROPOSED Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff John Robert Demos, Jr (Deficient - PLRA Statement Outdated) (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)**24 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(KMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demos v. Pence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Schumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robert Demos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?