Demos v. Dominion Voting Systems et al
Plaintiff: John Robert Demos, Jr
Defendant: Hua-Wei Technologies, Staple Street Capital, Flex China, Dominion Voting Systems and The Delian Project
Case Number: 2:2021cv00110
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2021 Filing 3 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff John Robert Demos, Jr to #2 Report and Recommendations. Noting Date 3/12/2021. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to the #1 Proposed Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by John Robert Demos, Jr; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Noted by clerk for: 3/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(SP)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 PROPOSED Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff John Robert Demos, Jr (Deficient - Incorrect Form) (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)**23 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(KMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demos v. Dominion Voting Systems et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hua-Wei Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staple Street Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flex China
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Voting Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Delian Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robert Demos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?