WSOU Investments LLC v. F5 Networks Inc
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments, LLC and WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development
Defendant: F5 Networks, Inc. and F5 Networks Inc
Counter Defendant: WSOU Investments LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00124
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ANSWER to #38 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by WSOU Investments LLC.(Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC by F5 Networks Inc.(Stark, Stevan)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant F5 Networks, Inc. on 2/1/2021, filed by Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/30/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/16/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/23/2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This action is reassigned to the Honorable Barbara Rothstein because it is related to Case No. CV 2:20-cv-01878-BJR. All pleadings filed in the future shall bear case numbers CV 21-00124 BJR. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #32 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Angela Tarasi for Defendant F5 Networks Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Angela C. Tarasi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant F5 Networks Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6937440 (Al-Salam, Ramsey)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #30 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David Shane Brun for Defendant F5 Networks Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shane Brun FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant F5 Networks Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6936518 (Al-Salam, Ramsey)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-01878; 2:21-cv-00123; 2:21-cv-00125; 2:21-cv-00126, by Defendant F5 Networks Inc. (Al-Salam, Ramsey)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/23/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/2/2021, Joint Status Report due by 3/9/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stevan Richard Stark, Jr on behalf of Defendant F5 Networks Inc. (Stark, Stevan)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by F5 Networks Inc (Al-Salam, Ramsey)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramsey M Al-Salam on behalf of Defendant F5 Networks Inc. (Al-Salam, Ramsey)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC (Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney ThucMinh Nguyen for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul G. Williams for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Marcus A Barber for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan K Waldrop for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John W Downing for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jack Shaw for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Heather S Kim for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Darcy L Jones for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ThucMinh Nguyen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6917177 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul G. Williams FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6917176 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Marcus A. Barber FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6917162 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan K. Waldrop FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6917160 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John W. Downing FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6917148 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jack Shaw FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6917120 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Heather S. Kim FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6917105 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Darcy L. Jones FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6917099 (Marks-Dias, Blake)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant F5 Networks Inc. (RE)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (RE)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Richard A. Jones added. (RE)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by WSOU Investments, LLC (Lindberg, Eric)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) F5 Networks, Inc. with ,JURY DEMAND, (Receipt # AWAWDC-6910381), filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons, #13 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Lindberg, Eric) Modified on 2/2/2021 to edit Jury Demand info. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WSOU Investments LLC v. F5 Networks Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments, LLC
Represented By: Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Represented By: Eric A Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development
Represented By: Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Represented By: Eric A Lindberg
Represented By: Paul G. Williams
Represented By: John W Downing
Represented By: Jack Shaw
Represented By: ThucMinh Nguyen
Represented By: Marcus A Barber
Represented By: Darcy L Jones
Represented By: Heather S Kim
Represented By: Jonathan K Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F5 Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F5 Networks Inc
Represented By: David Shane Brun
Represented By: Angela Tarasi
Represented By: Stevan Richard Stark, Jr.
Represented By: Ramsey M Al-Salam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: WSOU Investments LLC
Represented By: Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Represented By: Eric A Lindberg
Represented By: John W Downing
Represented By: Jack Shaw
Represented By: ThucMinh Nguyen
Represented By: Paul G. Williams
Represented By: Marcus A Barber
Represented By: Heather S Kim
Represented By: Darcy L Jones
Represented By: Jonathan K Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?