Adekunle et al v. GEO Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Damilola Adekunle and Fayah Tolno
Defendant: Sheri W. Malakhova, M.D., GEO Group, Inc, United States of America and Geo Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00135
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY, filed by Defendant Geo Group Inc, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Mell, Joan)
March 22, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION of MATTHEW J. WURDEMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiffs Damilola Adekunle, Fayah Tolno re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Wurdeman, Matthew)
March 22, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Damilola Adekunle, Fayah Tolno, to #12 MOTION to Dismiss . (Wurdeman, Matthew)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #15 Stipulated Motion to Seal: Exhibits A and B, docket no. #17 , to the Declaration of Joan K. Mell, shall remain under seal. To the extent that defendant's pending motion, docket no. #12 , seeks reconsideration of the Minute Order entered February 12, 2021, docket no. #11 , which stayed this case, plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file a response. See LCR 7(h)(3). Such response shall be consolidated with any substantive response to defendant's motion to dismiss. Defendant's motion, docket no. #12 , is RENOTED to March 26, 2021. Plaintiffs' response is due on March 22, 2021, and any reply is due by the new noting date. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(MW)
March 3, 2021 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT The Declaration of Joan Mell by Defendant Geo Group Inc re #15 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Declaration of Joan Mell, #16 Declaration (Mell, Joan)
March 3, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Joan Mell filed by Defendant Geo Group Inc re #15 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Declaration of Joan Mell (Mell, Joan)
March 3, 2021 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Declaration of Joan Mell, filed by Defendant Geo Group Inc. Noting Date 3/12/2021, (Mell, Joan)
February 19, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Mell, Joan)
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Joan K. Mell filed by Defendant Geo Group Inc re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Mell, Joan)
February 19, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Geo Group Inc. Noting Date 3/26/2021 3/19/2021, (Mell, Joan) Modified on 3/8/2021 (MW).
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs' request, docket no. #9 , that this matter be stayed pending their exhaustion of administrative remedies relating to their claims against the United States, is GRANTED. This case is STAYED until further order. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days after plaintiffs' administrative remedies are exhausted or by December 17, 2021, whichever occurs earlier. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO COURTS SHOW CAUSE ORDER of Matthew J. Wurdeman re #9 Notice-Other by Plaintiffs Damilola Adekunle, Fayah Tolno (Wurdeman, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO COURTS SHOW CAUSE ORDER re #7 Minute Order,,, Add and Terminate Parties,, ; filed by Plaintiffs Damilola Adekunle, Fayah Tolno. (Wurdeman, Matthew)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Geo Group Inc (Mell, Joan)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: The United States of America is SUBSTITUTED for Dr. Malakhova as a defendant in this matter. Pursuant to the stipulation, docket no. #6 , between plaintiffs and the United States, plaintiffs' claims against the United States are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Minute Order, the remaining parties, namely plaintiffs and defendant GEO, shall show cause why this case should not be remanded to the King County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal by parties (Waldrop, Matt)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Damilola Adekunle, Fayah Tolno (Wurdeman, Matthew)
February 5, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant GEO Group Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/12/2021. (KB)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
February 3, 2021 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SG)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Sheri W. Malakhova, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Records)(Waldrop, Matt)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Substitution Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2679(d)(1) ; filed by Defendant Sheri W. Malakhova, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Brian T. Moran, #2 Proposed Order Reforming Caption)(Waldrop, Matt)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-00228-1-SEA; () Attorney Matt Waldrop added to party Sheri W. Malakhova, M.D.(pty:dft), filed by Sheri W. Malakhova, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waldrop, Matt) (No Fee Required)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adekunle et al v. GEO Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri W. Malakhova, M.D.
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Group, Inc
Represented By: Joan K Mell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo Group Inc
Represented By: Joan K Mell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damilola Adekunle
Represented By: Samuel J Daheim
Represented By: Jackson Robert Pahlke
Represented By: Matthew J Wurdeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fayah Tolno
Represented By: Samuel J Daheim
Represented By: Jackson Robert Pahlke
Represented By: Matthew J Wurdeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?