Diaz et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ricky Diaz, Emanuel Adamson and Juan Manuel Alvarez
Defendant: Amazon Logistics Inc, Does 1-100 and Amazon.com Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00419
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 36 Stipulated MOTION of Withdrawal, filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc. Noting Date 5/12/2021, (Redekopp, Ryan)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #27 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jason D Burns for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, and Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #26 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John S Battenfeld for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, and Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #28 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian D Fahy for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, and for Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #30 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James Walsh, Jr for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, and for Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #29 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard G Rosenblatt for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, and Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 12, 2021 Filing 30 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James P. Walsh, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7038694 (Redekopp, Ryan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 29 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard G. Rosenblatt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7038688 (Redekopp, Ryan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 28 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian D. Fahy FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7038683 (Redekopp, Ryan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 27 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jason D. Burns FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7038665 (Redekopp, Ryan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 26 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John S. Battenfeld FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7038610 (Redekopp, Ryan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan Drew Redekopp on behalf of Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc. (Redekopp, Ryan)
March 29, 2021 Filing 24 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Northern District of California and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)
March 29, 2021 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of California Northern, Case Number 3:20-cv-07792.
March 29, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CDA)
March 24, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the Western District of Washington. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #21 Stipulation to transfer matter pursuant to first-to-file rule. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Transfer Matter Pursuant to First-to-File Rule filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 3/19/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 3/10/2021.Defendant is interested in transferring the matter to the Western District of Washington, to be heard with other related cases. Plaintiff will stipulate and the parties must file that stipulation on the docket. Defendants' deadline to respond to the complaint is 3/24/2021.Total Time in Court: 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 2:50 - 2:55. Plaintiff Attorney: James Treglio. Defendant Attorney: Megan Cooney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Continuing case management conference set for 3/3/2021 by one week. The case management conference is now scheduled for 3/10/2021 at 02:00 PM by Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/1/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
February 28, 2021 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 3/3/2021, AND PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc General Order 58. Perso ns granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 17 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 2/23/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 12/15/2020.The parties stipulation and request to stay the case is granted. The stay will remain in place until the next CMC. Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Total Time in Court: 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 2:55 - 3:03. Plaintiff Attorney: James Treglio. Defendant Attorney: Megan Cooney and Michael Holecek. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be pa rticipating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, February 25, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT ST AFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL FOR THE CMC ON 12/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2020, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: b> Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Tuesday, December 15, 2020, by no later than 9:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. p> (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. A case management conference is scheduled for Tuesday December 15 at 2 p.m. to discuss the stipulation to stay this action. The defendants need not respond to the complaint before then. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/11/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation And [Proposed} Order To Stay Action Pending Resolution Of The Petition For Writ Of Certiorari Seeking The United States Supreme Court's Review Of Rittmann v. Amazon.com, Inc., 970 F.3D 904 (9th Cir. 2020) filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 12/9/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. of Filing of Notice of Removal of Class Action With The Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal of Class Action with the Superior Court)(Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/25/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/18/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc... (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/17/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING re #6 Stipulation to Extend Time filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/6/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Or der 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/18/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. of Pendency of Related Actions (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Class Action from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG20072092. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15152697). Filed byAmazon.com, Inc., Amazon Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine V.A. Smith in Support of Defendants Amazon.com, Inc.'s and Amazon Logistics, Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Class Action, #2 Declaration of Alexa Hawrysz in Support of Defendants Amazon.com Inc.'s and Amazon Logistics, Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Class Action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2021: #5 State court complaint - added as separate attachment) (CDA). (Attachment 5 replaced on 3/31/2021 to add signature page) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Diaz
Represented By: Mark Dee Potter
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: James Michael Treglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Adamson
Represented By: Mark Dee Potter
Represented By: James Michael Treglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Manuel Alvarez
Represented By: Mark Dee Potter
Represented By: James Michael Treglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics Inc
Represented By: Katherine VA Smith
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Megan M. Cooney
Represented By: Michael J. Holecek
Represented By: Jason D Burns
Represented By: John S Battenfeld
Represented By: Richard G Rosenblatt
Represented By: Brian D Fahy
Represented By: James Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Drew Redekopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Katherine VA Smith
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Megan M. Cooney
Represented By: Michael J. Holecek
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Jason D Burns
Represented By: John S Battenfeld
Represented By: Richard G Rosenblatt
Represented By: Brian D Fahy
Represented By: James Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Drew Redekopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?