Benson Hill Kent LLC v. Shelton et al
Plaintiff: Benson Hill Kent LLC
Defendant: Michelle Johnson and Kevin Shelton
Case Number: 2:2021cv00516
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2021 Filing 13 RECEIPT from King County Superior Court re #12 Remand Letter to State Court. (MW)
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER to King County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court. (Letter, Certified Copy of #11 Order and Docket Sheet mailed to King County Superior Court) (MW)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Remanding Case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW) (cc: Defendants via USPS)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. The Court orders Defendants to show cause why this case should not be remanded to state court. Defendants shall file a written response to this order, not exceeding three (3) pages, on or before 5/17/2021. (cc: Defendants via USPS) (VE)
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE Withdrawing Case; filed by Defendants Michelle Johnson, Kevin Shelton. (MW)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 REDACTION to #3 Sealed Document by Defendants Michelle Johnson, Kevin Shelton (MW)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/4/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/11/2021, Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Defendants via USPS) (VE)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Defendants via USPS) (VE)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #3 Sealed Document, #1 Notice of Removal,,. ***Action Required*** Redaction.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/20/2021) (CDA).
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)cc defendants via US Mail
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT - Nationality IDs by Defendants Michelle Johnson, Kevin Shelton re #1 Notice of Removal. (Sealed administratively due to unredacted personal identifiers. (CDA)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-03222-9 KNT; () (Receipt # SEA104051), filed by Michelle Johnson, Kevin Shelton. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Eviction summons, #4 State court notice to service members, #5 State court writ of restitution, #6 UPS tracking document, #7 UPS tracking document 2, #8 Notice of public records corrections, #9 Notice of public records corrections 2, #10 Writ of discovery, #11 Certified treaty of peace, #12 Writ of Quo Warranto and default judgment, #13 Writ of Mandamus and Writ of Corum Nobis)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson Hill Kent LLC v. Shelton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benson Hill Kent LLC
Represented By: Keon Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?