Powers v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Michael Powers
Defendant: United States Coast Guard and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00517
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sara Leonetti on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Powers. (Leonetti, Sara)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly: Joint Status Report due by 7/30/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/16/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/16/2021. (KK)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States of America (MW)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Michael Powers (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Gahan, Tomas)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 REDACTION to #1 Complaint, Exhibit A by Plaintiff Michael Powers (Gahan, Tomas)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Simon Wampold on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Powers. (Wampold, Michael)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s), Redaction.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)ad hoc attorneys Wampold and Leonetti
April 19, 2021 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (CDA)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against defendant(s) United States Coast Guard (Receipt # AWAWDC-7046546) Attorney Tomas A Gahan added to party Michael Powers(pty:pla), filed by Michael Powers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2SEALED Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Gahan, Tomas) Modified on 4/19/2021 sealed Exhibit A due to unredacted personal identifiers (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Coast Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Powers
Represented By: Tomas A Gahan
Represented By: Sara Leonetti
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?