United States of America v. Aaron et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gladies M Aaron, CIM Trust 2019-R2, King County, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC and Phillip Aaron
Case Number: 2:2021cv00568
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Dane Alexander Searles for defendants Gladies M Aaron and Phillip Aaron, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel Scott Heller for defendants Gladies M Aaron and Phillip Aaron, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
June 24, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Dane A. Searles FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Gladies M Aaron, Phillip Aaron (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7139811 (Francis, Joann)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel S. Heller FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Gladies M Aaron, Phillip Aaron (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7139804 (Francis, Joann)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gerald W. Kelly, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Gladies M Aaron, Phillip Aaron (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7139793 (Francis, Joann)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Joann H Francis added to party Gladies M Aaron(pty:dft), Attorney Joann H Francis added to party Phillip Aaron(pty:dft) by Gladies M Aaron, Phillip Aaron.(Francis, Joann)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Gladies M. Aaron on 6/3/2021, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Tran, Yen)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Phillip Aaron on 6/3/2021, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Tran, Yen)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC on 6/8/2021, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Tran, Yen)
June 7, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to unopposed request of plaintiff's counsel and for good cause shown, the following deadlines are reset by the Court: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/12/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/19/2021, Joint Status Report due by 7/26/2021. (LC)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 6/25/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/11/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/18/2021. (LC)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by King County.(Atchison, Jennifer)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Gladies M Aaron, Phillip Aaron, CIM Trust 2019-R2, King County, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(RE)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer H Atchison on behalf of Defendant King County. (Atchison, Jennifer)
April 29, 2021 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Yen Jeannette Tran added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Phillip Aaron, #3 Summons Gladies M. Aaron, #4 Summons King County, #5 Summons CIM Trust 2019-R2, #6 Summons Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC)(Tran, Yen) (No Fee Required)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Aaron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladies M Aaron
Represented By: Joann H Francis
Represented By: Dane Alexander Searles
Represented By: Daniel Scott Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIM Trust 2019-R2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Jennifer H Atchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Aaron
Represented By: Joann H Francis
Represented By: Dane Alexander Searles
Represented By: Daniel Scott Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Yen Jeannette Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?