Wilder et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
Plaintiff: Abryel Wilder and Abryel Michole-Meena Wilder
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers and Office of Counsel
Case Number: 2:2021cv00574
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Referring Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Attorney Madison M. Burke added for Office of Counsel and United States Army Corps of Engineers; Brian J Baker added for United States Army Corps of Engineers, #19 Notice of Appearance. (LH) (Regenerated NEF for the Order of Dismissal at Dkt. #18 to attorneys Burke and Baker)
June 15, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian J Baker on behalf of Defendant Office of Counsel. (Baker, Brian)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice. No additional documents will be accepted for filing under this cause number other than a Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail)
June 1, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiff Abryel Michole-Meena Wilder re #16 Subpoena, #15 Subpoena. (LH) (No physical materials received)
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 Second REDACTED NEXT-DAY SUBPOENA; filed by Plaintiff Abryel Michole-Meena Wilder. (LH)
June 1, 2021 Filing 15 REDACTED NEXT-DAY SUBPOENA; filed by Plaintiff Abryel Michole-Meena Wilder. (LH)
May 28, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS by Plaintiff Abryel Michole-Meena Wilder. (LH) (Not issued, pursuant to 5/4/2021 instruction from chambers)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 Proof of Service re #12 Amended Complaint; filed by Plaintiff Abryel Michole-Meena Wilder. (LH)
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Abryel Michole-Meena Wilder. (LH) Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, this document been administratively sealed by the Court.
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT Second Request for Discovery, Notice of Law Enforcement, Demand for Experts by Plaintiff Abryel Michole-Meena Wilder. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, this document been administratively sealed by the Court. (LH)
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT Request for Discovery, Notice of Law Enforcement, Demand for Experts by Plaintiff Abryel Michole-Meena Wilder. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, this document been administratively sealed by the Court. (LH)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file on or before 6/1/2021, an amended complaint which clearly and concisely identifies the acts of which each named defendant is accused and provides sufficient facts to show that the defendant violated FOIA and/or participated in a conspiracy to violate plaintiff's rights under the U.S. Constitution or laws. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Order Requiring More Definite Statement re #9 Order, NOTED on motion calendar for 6/4/2021. (LH)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Abryel Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B)(LH)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. This case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Robert S. Lasnik as related to other cases filed by Plaintiff Abryel Wilder. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C21-0574RSL. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SR)(cc: Plaintiff via U.S. mail)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #2 Sealed Document,. ***Action Required*** Redaction.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address Filed by Plaintiff Abryel Wilder. (LH)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT Additional Civil Cover Sheets by Plaintiff Abryel Wilder re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Attachments: #1 Claim forms)(CDA) Modified on 4/30/2021 sealed administratively due to unredacted personal identifiers (CDA).
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L Peterson, filed by Abryel Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Attachment A - Additional Defendants, #3 Attachment B - claim summary, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Change of address, #6 Transaction form)(CDA) Modified on 4/30/2021 to add additional descriptive text (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilder et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Brian J Baker
Represented By: Madison M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Counsel
Represented By: Brian J Baker
Represented By: Madison M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abryel Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abryel Michole-Meena Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?