Paddock v. PeaceHealth Inc et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth R Paddock
Defendant: Jason M Stoane, Tung M Ha, John E Morrison, PeaceHealth Inc. doing business as St. Joseph's Medical Center doing business as Peacehealth Medical Group, Northwest Radiologists, Bellingham Anesthesia Associates, Paul B Fredette, David A Flarry, Camille A Miller, David E Baker, Joanna B Axelson, Fourth Corner Neurosurgical Associates, Carmen V Hellinga, PeaceHealth Inc doing business as St Joseph's Medical Center doing business as Peacehealth Medical Group, Bellingham Anesthesia Associates PS, Fourth Corner Neurosurgical Associates Inc PS and Northwest Radiologists Inc PS
Case Number: 2:2021cv00639
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Paul B Fredette, Camille A Miller.(Wick, Ketia)
July 8, 2021 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint; by Northwest Radiologists, Inc., P.S. and Jason M. Stoane, M.D. with JURY DEMAND by Northwest Radiologists Inc PS.(Lee, Donna)
July 7, 2021 Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 21-28 days. Jury Trial is set for 10/3/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 8/4/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 4/6/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/6/2022, Discovery completed by 6/5/2022, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 6/19/2022, Dispositive motions due by 7/5/2022, Motions in Limine due by 9/5/2022, Pretrial Order due by 9/21/2022, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/28/2022, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions and trial exhibits due by 9/28/2022 (KERR)
July 6, 2021 Filing 40 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 21-28. (Kinney, John)
July 2, 2021 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Joanna B Axelson, David A Flarry, Carmen V Hellinga, PeaceHealth Inc.(Moore, Jennifer)
June 24, 2021 Filing 38 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Northwest Radiologists Inc PS (Lee, Donna)
June 23, 2021 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant John E Morrison mailed on 6/23/2021 (Kinney, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fourth Corner Neurosurgical Associates Inc PS (O'Halloran, Scott)
June 23, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Caleb T Mathena on behalf of Defendants Paul B Fredette, Camille A Miller. (Mathena, Caleb)
June 23, 2021 Filing 34 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant John E Morrison, re #33 Amendment to #2 Summons. (LH)
June 22, 2021 Filing 33 AMENDMENT to #2 Summons Issued, by Plaintiff Elizabeth R Paddock (Kinney, John)
June 22, 2021 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bellingham Anesthesia Associates PS (Johnson, Brennen)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #29 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File Amended Summons. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SR)
June 18, 2021 Attorney Gordon L Welborn added for Northwest Radiologists Inc PS and Jason M Stoane; per #30 Praecipe to Attach Document. (LH)
June 18, 2021 Filing 30 PRAECIPE to attach document (corrected signature page) re #26 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Northwest Radiologists Inc PS (Lee, Donna)
June 17, 2021 Filing 29 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Amended Summons, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth R Paddock. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/17/2021, (Kinney, John)
June 17, 2021 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #26 , #27 Notices of Appearance were improperly signed by Gordon L. Welborn. As such, Mr. Welborn was not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file one corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to either original filing. (LH)
June 16, 2021 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Radiologists Inc PS (Lee, Donna)
June 16, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donna L. Lee on behalf of Defendant Jason M Stoane. (Lee, Donna)
June 16, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donna L. Lee on behalf of Defendant Northwest Radiologists Inc PS. (Lee, Donna)
June 15, 2021 Attorney Erin E Ehlert added for David E Baker, Fourth Corner Neurosurgical Associates Inc PS, and Tung M Ha, per #24 Notice of Appearance. (LH)
June 15, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND by Bellingham Anesthesia Associates PS.(Johnson, Brennen)
June 15, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Scott M O'Halloran on behalf of Defendants David E Baker, Fourth Corner Neurosurgical Associates Inc PS, Tung M Ha. (O'Halloran, Scott)
June 14, 2021 Filing 23 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Paul B Fredette, Camille A Miller (Wick, Ketia)
June 14, 2021 Filing 22 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Joanna B Axelson, David A Flarry, Carmen V Hellinga, PeaceHealth Inc (Moore, Jennifer)
June 14, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by PeaceHealth Inc (Moore, Jennifer)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2021, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
June 9, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Fourth Corner Neurosurgical Associates Inc PS mailed on 5/28/2021 (Kinney, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Tung M Ha mailed on 5/28/2021 (Kinney, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant David E Baker mailed on 5/28/2021 (Kinney, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Bellingham Anesthesia Associates, P.S. on 5/25/2021, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth R Paddock. (Kinney, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on PeaceHealth, Inc. d/b/a St. Joseph's Medical Center and PeaceHealth Medical Group on 5/26/2021, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth R Paddock. (Kinney, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Camille A. Miller, M.D. on 5/25/2021, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth R Paddock. (Kinney, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Carmen V. Hellinga, R.N. on 5/25/2021, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth R Paddock. (Kinney, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Paul B. Fredette, M.D. on 5/25/2021, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth R Paddock. (Kinney, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on David A. Flarry on 5/29/2021, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth R Paddock. (Kinney, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Joanna B. Axelson, R.N. on 5/26/2021, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth R Paddock. (Kinney, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ketia Berry Wick on behalf of Defendants Paul B Fredette, Camille A Miller. (Wick, Ketia)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Northwest Radiologists Inc PS mailed on 5/28/2021 (Kinney, John)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jason M Stoane mailed on 5/28/2021 (Kinney, John)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lauren M Martin on behalf of Defendants Joanna B Axelson, David A Flarry, Carmen V Hellinga, PeaceHealth Inc. (Martin, Lauren)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer L Moore on behalf of Defendants Joanna B Axelson, David A Flarry, Carmen V Hellinga, PeaceHealth Inc. (Moore, Jennifer)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brennen Johnson on behalf of Defendants Bellingham Anesthesia Associates PS, John E Morrison. (Johnson, Brennen)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip deMaine Brennen Johnson on behalf of Defendants Bellingham Anesthesia Associates PS, John E Morrison. (Johnson, Brennen) Modified attorney name on 5/27/2021 (LH).
May 27, 2021 Attorney Philip Matthew de Maine added for Bellingham Anesthesia Associates PS and John E Morrison, per #4 Notice of Appearance. (LH)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(SG)
May 17, 2021 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SG)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7084696) Attorney John Kinney, III added to party Elizabeth R Paddock(pty:pla), filed by Elizabeth R Paddock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons PeaceHealth Summons, #3 Summons Bellingham Anesthesia Associates, P.S. Summons, #4 Summons Fourth Corner Neurosurgery Associates, Inc. P.S. Summons, #5 Summons Northwest Radiologists, Inc., P.S. Summons, #6 Summons David E. Baker, M.D. Summons, #7 Summons Jason M. Stoane, M.D. Summons, #8 Summons Paul B. Fredette, M.D. Summons, #9 Summons John E. Morrison, M.D. Summons, #10 Summons Carmen V. Hellinga, R.N. Summons, #11 Summons David A. Flarry, R.N. Summons, #12 Summons Joanna B. Axelson, R.N. Summons, #13 Summons Camille A. Miller, M.D. Summons, #14 Summons Tung M. Ha, D.O. Summons)(Kinney, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paddock v. PeaceHealth Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth R Paddock
Represented By: John Kinney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason M Stoane
Represented By: Donna L. Lee
Represented By: Gordon L Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tung M Ha
Represented By: Erin E Ehlert
Represented By: Scott M O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E Morrison
Represented By: Brennen Johnson
Represented By: Philip Matthew de Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PeaceHealth Inc. doing business as St. Joseph's Medical Center doing business as Peacehealth Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Radiologists
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellingham Anesthesia Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul B Fredette
Represented By: Caleb T Mathena
Represented By: Ketia Berry Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Flarry
Represented By: Jennifer L Moore
Represented By: Lauren M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille A Miller
Represented By: Caleb T Mathena
Represented By: Ketia Berry Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E Baker
Represented By: Erin E Ehlert
Represented By: Scott M O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna B Axelson
Represented By: Jennifer L Moore
Represented By: Lauren M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fourth Corner Neurosurgical Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen V Hellinga
Represented By: Jennifer L Moore
Represented By: Lauren M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PeaceHealth Inc doing business as St Joseph's Medical Center doing business as Peacehealth Medical Group
Represented By: Jennifer L Moore
Represented By: Lauren M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellingham Anesthesia Associates PS
Represented By: Brennen Johnson
Represented By: Philip Matthew de Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fourth Corner Neurosurgical Associates Inc PS
Represented By: Erin E Ehlert
Represented By: Scott M O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Radiologists Inc PS
Represented By: Donna L. Lee
Represented By: Gordon L Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?