Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al v. Hie et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Phillip Dovinh, John Hie, Don Sly, George Blair, Foss Maritime Company, LLC, Jane Doe Dovinh and Foss Maritime Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00641
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Geoff J M Bridgman on behalf of Defendant John Hie. (Bridgman, Geoff)
June 17, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Foss Maritime Company LLC mailed on 5/18/2021 (West, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David R West on behalf of Defendant Foss Maritime Company LLC. (West, David)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel Bench on behalf of Defendant George Blair. (Bench, Rachel)
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 PRAECIPE re #8 Waiver of Service by Defendant George Blair (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cohen, Anne)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anne Cohen on behalf of Defendant George Blair. (Cohen, Anne)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant George Blair mailed on 5/18/2021 (Cohen, Anne)
May 19, 2021 Attorney Shaunta Marie Knibb added for Jane Doe Dovinh, Phillip Dovinh, per #7 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher Cavallar Mason on behalf of Defendants Jane Doe Dovinh, Phillip Dovinh. (Mason, Christopher)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jane Doe Dovinh mailed on 5/18/2021 (Foley, Douglas)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Phillip Dovinh mailed on 5/18/2021 (Foley, Douglas)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(SG)
May 17, 2021 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SG)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC & The Allstate Corporation as no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Foley, Douglas) Modified on 5/18/2021 to reflect corporate parents (MET).
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7084793), filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Foley, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al v. Hie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas F Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Douglas F Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Dovinh
Represented By: Christopher Cavallar Mason
Represented By: Shaunta Marie Knibb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hie
Represented By: Geoff J M Bridgman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Sly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Blair
Represented By: Anne Cohen
Represented By: Rachel Bench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foss Maritime Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Dovinh
Represented By: Christopher Cavallar Mason
Represented By: Shaunta Marie Knibb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foss Maritime Company LLC
Represented By: David R West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?