Kovacs v. Life Care Centers of America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Darcy Kovacs
Defendant: Todd Fletcher, Lake Vue Operations, LLC, Ellie Basham, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Life Care Centers of America Inc and Lake Vue Operations LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00741
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/24/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/31/2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER. The referral to the Hon. Michelle L. Peterson is terminated. Judge Peterson is no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 23, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT)
July 22, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #14 Report: Dkt 14 is stricken from the docket due to a duplicate entry being filed at dkt #15 . (SR)
July 22, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT re #14 Report Corrected Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Plaintiff Darcy Kovacs (Thomas, Tad)
July 22, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT Of Parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Plaintiff Darcy Kovacs (Thomas, Tad) Modified to strike entry due to duplicate entry being filed at dkt #15 on 7/23/2021 (SR).
June 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian Ernst on behalf of Defendants Ellie Basham, Todd Fletcher, Lake Vue Operations LLC, Life Care Centers of America Inc. (Ernst, Brian)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian Jasper for Plaintiff Darcy Kovacs, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tad Thomas for Plaintiff Darcy Kovacs, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tad Thomas FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Darcy Kovacs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7123464 (Boyd, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian Jasper FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Darcy Kovacs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7123449 (Boyd, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 Life Care Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal,, . by Lake Vue Operations LLC, Life Care Centers of America Inc.(Tift, David)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 7/22/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/1/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/15/2021, by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour and referred to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and Amended General Order 02-19. (TF)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Lake Vue Operations LLC, Life Care Centers of America Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Meier, Kristin)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 6/14/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
June 7, 2021 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (RE)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lake Vue Operations, LLC, Life Care Centers of America, Inc. (Meier, Kristin)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-04630-1 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7112650) Attorney Kristin Nealey Meier added to party Lake Vue Operations, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nealey Meier added to party Life Care Centers of America, Inc.(pty:dft), filed by Lake Vue Operations, LLC, Life Care Centers of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Complaint)(Meier, Kristin) Modified on 6/7/2021 to edit document titles. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kovacs v. Life Care Centers of America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Fletcher
Represented By: David L Tift
Represented By: Brian Ernst
Represented By: Kristin Nealey Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Vue Operations, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Nealey Meier
Represented By: David L Tift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellie Basham
Represented By: David L Tift
Represented By: Brian Ernst
Represented By: Kristin Nealey Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin Nealey Meier
Represented By: David L Tift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America Inc
Represented By: David L Tift
Represented By: Brian Ernst
Represented By: Kristin Nealey Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Vue Operations LLC
Represented By: David L Tift
Represented By: Brian Ernst
Represented By: Kristin Nealey Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcy Kovacs
Represented By: Jeffrey D Boyd
Represented By: Deborah M Nelson
Represented By: Brian Jasper
Represented By: Tad Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?