Alaska Marine Lines Inc v. Dunlap Towing Company
Plaintiff: Alaska Marine Lines Inc
Defendant: Dunlap Towing Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00842
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION for Continuance, filed by Plaintiff Alaska Marine Lines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/19/2021, (Jones, Jeremy)
August 13, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Alaska Marine Lines Inc, TO RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Jeremy)
August 9, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Defendant Dunlap Towing Company, to #15 MOTION to Remand . Oral Argument Requested. (Holland, Barbara)
July 27, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Dunlap Towing Company.(Holland, Barbara)
July 23, 2021 Upon the request of the parties, and with good cause, the following deadlines are continued: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/23/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/7/2021, Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2021. (TF)
July 22, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Everett Billingslea filed by Plaintiff Alaska Marine Lines Inc re #15 MOTION to Remand (Jones, Jeremy)
July 22, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Christopher W. Nicoll filed by Plaintiff Alaska Marine Lines Inc re #15 MOTION to Remand (Jones, Jeremy)
July 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Alaska Marine Lines Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/13/2021, (Jones, Jeremy)
July 22, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Dunlap Towing Company, filed by Alaska Marine Lines Inc.(Nicoll, Christopher)
July 2, 2021 Filing 13 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Dunlap Towing Company (Holland, Barbara)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Emma Cothi Jones for Defendant Dunlap Towing Company, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Emma C. Jones FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Dunlap Towing Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7148439 (Holland, Barbara)
June 30, 2021 Attorney Jeremy Jones added for Alaska Marine Lines Inc; per #9 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Lynden Incorporated for Alaska Marine Lines Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alaska Marine Lines Inc (Nicoll, Christopher)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher W Nicoll on behalf of Plaintiff Alaska Marine Lines Inc. (Nicoll, Christopher)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 8/11/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/21/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/4/2021, by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dunlap Towing Company (Holland, Barbara)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (TF)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/1/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John D Kimball for Defendant Dunlap Towing Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 24, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff Alaska Marine Lines Inc and Defendant Dunlap Towing Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/1/2021. (RE)
June 24, 2021 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (RE)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John D. Kimball FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Dunlap Towing Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7137744 (Holland, Barbara)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kings County Superior Court, case number 21-2-07477-1 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7137407) Attorney Barbara L. Holland added to party Dunlap Towing Company(pty:dft), filed by Dunlap Towing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Case Information Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Order Setting Civil Case Schedule, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holland, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaska Marine Lines Inc v. Dunlap Towing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Marine Lines Inc
Represented By: Christopher W Nicoll
Represented By: Jeremy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunlap Towing Company
Represented By: Barbara L. Holland
Represented By: Emma Cothi Jones
Represented By: John D Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?