Wilson v. Ponce et al
Plaintiff: "Jane Doe" Ponce, Penske Truck Leasing Co LP and Preston Wilson
Defendant: Gerardo Ponce, Jane Doe Ponce and Penske Truck Leasing Co LP of Washington
Case Number: 2:2021cv00849
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent PTL GP, LLC, Corporate Parent PTL GP, LLC for Penske Truck Leasing Co LP of Washington. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Penske Truck Leasing Co LP of Washington (Lombardi, Drew)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Gabriel_Traber@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)ad hoc Catherine Brumbaugh Modified on 6/25/2021 per call from law office, Ms. Brumbaugh will not be submitting a Notice of Appearance (CDA).
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)
June 25, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Penske Truck Leasing must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/2/2021. (CDA)
June 25, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CDA)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-02771-3SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7138644), filed by Jane Doe Ponce, Gerardo Ponce, Penske Truck Leasing Co LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lombardi, Drew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2021: #2 Complaint) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Ponce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: "Jane Doe" Ponce
Represented By: Drew Vincent Lombardi
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penske Truck Leasing Co LP
Represented By: Drew Vincent Lombardi
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Wilson
Represented By: J D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Ponce
Represented By: Drew Vincent Lombardi
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Ponce
Represented By: Drew Vincent Lombardi
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co LP of Washington
Represented By: Drew Vincent Lombardi
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?