Wang et al v. Athira Pharma Inc et al
Plaintiff: Hang Gao and Fan Wang
Defendant: Athira Pharma, Inc., Leen Kawas and Athira Pharma Inc
Consolidated Plaintiff: Harshdeep Jawandha, Timothy Slyne and Tai Slyne
Consolidated Defendant: Glenna Mileson, Tadataka Yamada, Joseph Edelman, John M Fluke Jr, James A Johnson, Goldman Sachs & Co LLC, Jefferies LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated and JMP Securities LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00861
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of a Party's Death ; filed by Defendant Athira Pharma Inc, Consol Defendants Joseph Edelman, John M Fluke Jr, James A Johnson, Glenna Mileson, Tadataka Yamada. (Watts, Gregory)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-00864 Waiver of Service by Underwriter Defendants and Leen Kawas Ph.D. by parties (Farris, Juli)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 WAIVER re Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-00864 by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated by Consol Plaintiffs Tai Slyne, Timothy Slyne (Farris, Juli)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 WAIVER re Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-00864 by Dr. Leen Kawas by Consol Plaintiffs Tai Slyne, Timothy Slyne (Farris, Juli)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 WAIVER re Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-00864 by JMP Securities, LLC by Consol Plaintiffs Tai Slyne, Timothy Slyne (Farris, Juli)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 WAIVER re Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-00864 by Jefferies LLC by Consol Plaintiffs Tai Slyne, Timothy Slyne (Farris, Juli)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 WAIVER re Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-00864 by Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC by Consol Plaintiffs Tai Slyne, Timothy Slyne (Farris, Juli)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric Ryan Laliberte on behalf of Consol Plaintiffs Tai Slyne, Timothy Slyne. (Laliberte, Eric)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER re Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-00864 by Glenna Mileson by Consol Plaintiffs Tai Slyne, Timothy Slyne (Farris, Juli)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER re Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-00864 by James A. Johnson by Consol Plaintiffs Tai Slyne, Timothy Slyne (Farris, Juli)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER re Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-00864 by John M. Fluke, Jr. by Consol Plaintiffs Tai Slyne, Timothy Slyne (Farris, Juli)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER re Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-00864 by Joseph Edelman by Consol Plaintiffs Tai Slyne, Timothy Slyne (Farris, Juli)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John J Clarke, Jr for Consol Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, and Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER re Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-00864 by Athira Pharma, Inc. by Consol Plaintiffs Tai Slyne, Timothy Slyne (Farris, Juli)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John J. Clarke, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Consol Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7204398 (Todaro, Anthony)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, docket no. #14 , to consolidate related action under Local Civil Rule 42, the above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. All future pleadings, motions, briefs, and other papers shall be filed only in Case No. C21-861 TSZ. The pretrial deadlines set in Case No. C21-861 TSZ, see docket nos. #4 & #12 , shall control. Within fourteen (14) days of the Court's Order for the appointment of Lead Plaintiff and approval of Lead Counsel pursuant to the PSLRA, the Lead Plaintiff and Defendants shall meet and confer and submit a schedule for the filing of a consolidated complaint or designation of an operative complaint, and a briefing schedule for Defendants' anticipated motion(s) to dismiss. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Consolidate Related Actions Under Local Rule 42, filed by Defendant Athira Pharma Inc. Noting Date 8/5/2021, (Watts, Gregory)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer E.K. Kendrex on behalf of Defendant Athira Pharma Inc. (Kendrex, Jennifer)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting the parties' #11 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint and Vacate Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint and Vacate Discovery Deadlines, filed by Defendant Athira Pharma Inc. Noting Date 7/23/2021, (Watts, Gregory)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Leen Kawas mailed on 7/23/2021 (Stephens, Kim)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sean C Knowles on behalf of Defendant Leen Kawas. (Knowles, Sean)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Athira Pharma Inc mailed on 7/21/2021 (Stephens, Kim)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Athira Pharma Inc (Watts, Gregory)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gregory Lewis Watts on behalf of Defendant Athira Pharma Inc. (Watts, Gregory)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorneys John C Roberts, Jr, Tyre L. Tindall added for Athira Pharma Inc; per #6 Notice of Appearance. Attorney Jennifer E.K. Kendrex has not been admitted to practice in the Western District of Washington. (MW)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00864-JLR and 2:21-cv-00862-JCC, by Plaintiffs Hang Gao, Fan Wang. (Stephens, Kim)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/16/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/30/2021. (SRS)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiffs Hang Gao, Fan Wang. (Stephens, Kim)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (RE)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Athira Pharma, Inc., Leen Kawas with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7141466), filed by Fan Wang, Hang Gao. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Certification)(Stephens, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang et al v. Athira Pharma Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hang Gao
Represented By: Cecily C Shiel
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Cecily Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fan Wang
Represented By: Cecily C Shiel
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Cecily Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athira Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leen Kawas
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athira Pharma Inc
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Represented By: Jennifer E.K. Kendrex
Represented By: John C Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: Tyre L. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Harshdeep Jawandha
Represented By: Pavithra Rajesh
Represented By: Benjamin T.G. Nivison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Timothy Slyne
Represented By: Howard T Longman
Represented By: Eric Ryan Laliberte
Represented By: Juli E. Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tai Slyne
Represented By: Howard T Longman
Represented By: Eric Ryan Laliberte
Represented By: Juli E. Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Glenna Mileson
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Represented By: Jennifer E.K. Kendrex
Represented By: John C Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: Tyre L. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Tadataka Yamada
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Represented By: Jennifer E.K. Kendrex
Represented By: John C Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: Tyre L. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Joseph Edelman
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Represented By: Jennifer E.K. Kendrex
Represented By: John C Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: Tyre L. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John M Fluke Jr
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Represented By: Jennifer E.K. Kendrex
Represented By: John C Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: Tyre L. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: James A Johnson
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Represented By: Jennifer E.K. Kendrex
Represented By: John C Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: Tyre L. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co LLC
Represented By: John J Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Lianna M Bash
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Jefferies LLC
Represented By: John J Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Lianna M Bash
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated
Represented By: John J Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Lianna M Bash
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: JMP Securities LLC
Represented By: John J Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Lianna M Bash
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?