Welch et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: David Welch, Linda Welch and David J Welch
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Brand Insulations, Inc., A.W. Chesterton Company, North Coast Electric Company and Warren Pumps, Goulds Pumps, Inc. and ITT Corporation, IMO Industries Inc, Metalclad Insulation Corporation and Caterpillar, Inc., P-G Industries, Inc., BW/IP International Inc, Tate Andale, LLC and Haskell Corporation, Carrier Corporation, The William Powell Company, The Nash Engineering Company and Weir Valve & Controls USA, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Electrolux Home Products, Inc.; ViacomCBS, Inc.; Spirax Sarco, Inc. and General Electric, Flowserve US Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Atlantic Richfield Company; BP America, Inc.; BP Corporation of North America, Inc.; and BP Products North America, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., BW/IP Inc, Cooper Industries Inc, Metalclad Insulation LLC, AW Chesterton Company, Caterpillar Inc, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc, BP Corporation of North America Inc, BP Products North America Inc, Brand Insulations Inc, Borg-Warner Industrial Products, The Cooper-Bessemer Corporation, Electrolux Home Products Inc, Flowserve US Inc, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC, Haskell Corporation, ITT LLC, North Coast Electric Company, Pfizer Inc, P-G Industries Inc, Spirax Sarco Inc, Tate Andale LLC, The Nash Engineering Company, Velan Valve Corporation, ViacomCBS Inc, TWC The Valve Company LLC, Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc and Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00904
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 116 RECEIPT by King County Superior Court re #108 Order on Motion to Remand. (PM)
August 26, 2021 Filing 115 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #104 MOTION for Sanctions Against Mark Tuvim and Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani ; by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch. (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa)
August 26, 2021 ***Motion terminated: Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. No. #104 ) is hereby TERMINATED per Plaintiffs' Notice to Withdraw the Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. No. 115).(IJM)
August 24, 2021 Filing 114 LETTER to King County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court (PM) (cc: letter, remand order, docket sheet sent to King County Superior Court via USPS)
August 23, 2021 Filing 113 DECLARATION of Mark Tuvim ISO Opposition to Pltfs' Motion for Sanctions filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation re #104 MOTION for Sanctions Against Mark Tuvim and Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani (Tuvim, Mark)
August 23, 2021 Filing 112 RESPONSE, by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation, to #104 MOTION for Sanctions Against Mark Tuvim and Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani. (Tuvim, Mark)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES re #23 Motion for Remand; re #108 Order on Motion to Remand. The Court AWARDS $13,750 to Plaintiffs as the reasonable amount of attorneys' fees incurred in obtaining a remand of this matter after Velan Valve Corp. improperly removed it from King County Superior Court. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
August 16, 2021 Filing 110 DECLARATION of Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund Re: Attorneys Fees on Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch re #23 MOTION to Remand (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa)
August 16, 2021 Filing 109 DECLARATION of Matthew P. Bergman, Re: Attorney's Fees on Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch re #23 MOTION to Remand (Bergman, Matthew)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER REMANDING AND AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re Plaintiffs' #23 Motion to Remand. The Court GRANTS the #23 Motion, REMANDS this matter to King County Superior Court, and GRANTS Plaintiffs' request attorneys' fees and costs. Within seven days of entry of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file the requested materials necessary for the Court to set the proper award of attorneys' fees and costs. And although the Court remands this matter, it will still consider and rule on Plaintiffs' #104 Motion for Sanctions, which notes on August 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded on the 15th day following the date of this Order, on 8/24/2021. (PM)
August 6, 2021 Filing 107 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint; by Union Carbide Corporation.(Basauri, Taryn) Modified on 8/9/2021 to identify as First Amended Complaint(PM).
August 6, 2021 Filing 106 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Flowserve US Inc.(Basauri, Taryn) Modified on 8/9/2021 to identify as First Amended Complaint (PM).
August 5, 2021 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch re #104 MOTION for Sanctions Against Mark Tuvim and Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa)
August 5, 2021 Filing 104 MOTION for Sanctions Against Mark Tuvim and Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/27/2021, (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER re parties' #102 Stipulation. It is ORDERED that all Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Carrier Corporation, only are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs or attorney fees as to any party. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 29, 2021 Filing 102 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) of Dismissal as to Defendant Carrier Corporation Only (Uhle, Megan)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re #99 Stipulation. All of the Plaintiffs' claims against defendant BW/IP are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party, reserving to Plaintiffs their claims against all other parties. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re parties' #98 Stipulation. Plaintiffs' claims against defendant Caterpillar Inc. only are dismissed without prejudice, reserving to plaintiffs their claims against all other parties. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 28, 2021 Filing 99 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of dismissal as to BW/IP, Inc. by parties (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 28, 2021 Filing 98 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to dismiss CAT by parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hanson, Lorianne)
July 26, 2021 Filing 97 The William Powell Company's Answer to Second Amended Complant ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, #30 Second Amended Complaint. by The William Powell Company.(Hicks, James)
July 26, 2021 Filing 96 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BP America Inc (Fandel, Kent)
July 26, 2021 Filing 95 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Corporation of North America Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BP Corporation of North America Inc (Fandel, Kent)
July 26, 2021 Filing 94 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Products North America Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BP Products North America Inc (Fandel, Kent)
July 26, 2021 Filing 93 DECLARATION of Mark B. Tuvim ISO Velan Valve Corp.'s Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation re #23 MOTION to Remand (Tuvim, Mark)
July 26, 2021 Filing 92 RESPONSE, by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation, to #23 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tuvim, Mark)
July 23, 2021 Filing 91 Supplemental DECLARATION of Matthew P. Bergman filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch re #23 MOTION to Remand (Bergman, Matthew)
July 23, 2021 Filing 90 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch, TO RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa)
July 22, 2021 Attorney Melissa K Roeder added as counsel for The William Powell Company per #89 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
July 21, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James D Hicks on behalf of Defendant The William Powell Company. (Hicks, James)
July 21, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE of Settlement of ViacomCBS Inc. by Defendant ViacomCBS Inc (Serko, Alice)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re #86 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel Michael Finer for Defendant Carrier Corporation, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 21, 2021 Filing 86 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel M. Finer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Carrier Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7174292 (Uhle, Megan) Local counsel maintains offices in Seattle, WA and Portland, OR 7/21/2021 (DS).
July 21, 2021 Filing 85 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation plc for Cooper Industries Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cooper Industries Inc (Hanson, Lorianne)
July 21, 2021 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lorianne Hanson on behalf of Defendant Cooper Industries Inc. (Hanson, Lorianne)
July 21, 2021 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Karleen Joy Scharer on behalf of Defendant Cooper Industries Inc. (Scharer, Karleen)
July 21, 2021 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine M. Steele on behalf of Defendant Cooper Industries Inc. (Steele, Katherine)
July 21, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brittany A. Madderra on behalf of Defendant Cooper Industries Inc. (Madderra, Brittany)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' and Defendant Westinghouse Electric's #76 Stipulated Motion. All Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Westinghouse Electric only are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs or attorney fees as to any party. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 20, 2021 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Mark B. Tuvim ISO Velan Valve Corp.'s Response re Order to Show Cause re #47 Order to Show Cause, by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation (Tuvim, Mark)
July 20, 2021 Filing 78 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation re: #47 Order to Show Cause, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tuvim, Mark)
July 20, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher S Marks on behalf of Defendant Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (Marks, Christopher)
July 20, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE TO FILER re #76 Stipulation and Proposed Order. After review of the service lists and the #75 Verification of State Court Records, there's no indication that attorney Christopher S. Marks has appeared for Defendant Westinghouse Electric Corporation. This deficiency can be corrected by Mr. Marks filing a Notice of Appearance on behalf of Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (PM)
July 19, 2021 Filing 76 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order of Dismissal of Westinghouse Electric Corporation - Only, filed by Defendant Westinghouse Electric Corporation. Noting Date 7/19/2021, (Marks, Christopher)
July 16, 2021 Filing 75 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tuvim, Mark)
July 16, 2021 Filing 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for Atlantic Richfield Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Atlantic Richfield Company (Fandel, Kent)
July 16, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine M. Steele on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar Inc. (Steele, Katherine)
July 16, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine M. Steele on behalf of Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Steele, Katherine)
July 16, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Karleen Joy Scharer on behalf of Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Scharer, Karleen)
July 16, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Karleen Joy Scharer on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar Inc. (Scharer, Karleen)
July 16, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kyle A Jones on behalf of Defendant P-G Industries Inc. (Jones, Kyle)
July 16, 2021 Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Haskell Corporation (Jones, Kyle)
July 16, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kyle A Jones on behalf of Defendant Haskell Corporation. (Jones, Kyle)
July 15, 2021 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #60 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Katherine M. Steel and Karleen J. Scharer. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing or file a new Notice of Appearance with the correct electronic signatures. (PM)
July 14, 2021 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Electric Company (Serko, Alice)
July 14, 2021 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by North Coast Electric Company (Eraut, Allen)
July 14, 2021 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Sarco International Corporation, Other Affiliate Spirax-Sarco Investments, Ltd., Other Affiliate Spirax-Sarco Engineering, plc for Spirax Sarco Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Spirax Sarco Inc (Serko, Alice)
July 14, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allen Eraut on behalf of Defendant North Coast Electric Company. (Eraut, Allen)
July 14, 2021 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate AB Electrolux, Other Affiliate Copes Vulcan for Electrolux Home Products Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Electrolux Home Products Inc (Serko, Alice)
July 14, 2021 Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Caterpillar Inc (Hanson, Lorianne)
July 14, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lorianne Hanson on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar Inc. (Hanson, Lorianne)
July 14, 2021 Attorney George S. Pitcher added for Flowserve US Inc per #58 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
July 13, 2021 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flowserve US Inc (Basauri, Taryn)
July 13, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Taryn M Basauri on behalf of Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (Basauri, Taryn)
July 13, 2021 Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint; Second Amended Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal by IMO Industries Inc.(Ricketts, Michael) Modified on 7/14/2021 to add "Amended" and add link to dkt #1 .
July 13, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, . by Pfizer Inc.(Alkhazov, Marissa) Modified on 7/14/2021 to identify as second amended complaint (PM).
July 13, 2021 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by IMO Industries Inc (Ricketts, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Edward Ricketts on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries Inc. (Ricketts, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 53 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand . by The Nash Engineering Company.(Uhle, Megan) Modified on 7/14/2021 to identify as second amended complaint (PM).
July 13, 2021 Filing 52 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand . by Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc.(Uhle, Megan) Modified on 7/14/2021 to identify as second amended complaint(PM).
July 13, 2021 Filing 51 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand . by Carrier Corporation.(Uhle, Megan) Modified on 7/14/2021 to identify second amended complaint (PM).
July 13, 2021 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Carrier Global Corporation for Carrier Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Carrier Corporation (Uhle, Megan)
July 13, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lorianne Hanson on behalf of Defendant Metaclaid Insulation LLC. (Hanson, Lorianne)
July 13, 2021 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Metaclaid Insulation LLC (Madderra, Brittany)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Plaintiffs' #23 Emergency MOTION to Remand. The Court ORDERS Velan to SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be remanded and why sanctions for the improper removal should not be imposed. Show Cause Response due 7 days from the date of this order. Plaintiffs permitted a response 3 days after Velan's response. No reply. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 13, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brittany A. Madderra on behalf of Defendant Metaclaid Insulation LLC. (Madderra, Brittany)
July 13, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nicole R. MacKenzie on behalf of Defendant Carrier Corporation. (MacKenzie, Nicole)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiffs' #36 Notice of Settlement. In order to terminate these defendants from this matter, the Parties must file a notice of settlement and dismissal with signatures from counsel for Plaintiffs and Gould Pumps (IPG), LLC and ITT, LLC. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 13, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #37 Answer to Complaint: edited text to reflect this document was filed in error per #43 Praecipe. (PM)
July 12, 2021 Filing 43 PRAECIPE re Pleading Filed in Error by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation (Tuvim, Mark)
July 12, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kyle A Jones on behalf of Defendant Tate Andale LLC. (Jones, Kyle)
July 12, 2021 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Tate Andale LLC (Jones, Kyle)
July 12, 2021 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 -2, #30 Second Amended Complaint; by Tate Andale LLC.(Jones, Kyle) Modified on 7/13/2021 to reflect answer is to second amended complaint and to add links (PM).
July 12, 2021 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Velan, Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Velan Valve Corporation (Tuvim, Mark)
July 12, 2021 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 #30 Second Amended Complaint; and Affirmative Defenses by Velan Valve Corporation.(Tuvim, Mark) Modified on 7/13/2021 to reflect answer is to second amended complaint and add links (PM).
July 12, 2021 Filing 37 ***DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR per dkt. #43 .*** ANSWER to Complaint; and Affirmative Defenses by Velan Valve Corporation.(Tuvim, Mark) Modified on 7/13/2021 to strike. (PM).
July 12, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Settlement of Defendants Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC and ITT LLC, only, by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa)
July 12, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kent Michael Fandel on behalf of Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc, BP Corporation of North America Inc, BP Products North America Inc. (Fandel, Kent)
July 12, 2021 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc., Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Basauri, Taryn)
July 12, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Taryn M Basauri on behalf of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Basauri, Taryn)
July 12, 2021 Defendants AW Chesterton Company, Caterpillar Inc and Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc added per #30 Praecipe - Second Amended Complaint. (PM)
July 9, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, . by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Gawlowski, Richard)
July 9, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Trevor J. Mohr on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (Mohr, Trevor)
July 9, 2021 Filing 30 PRAECIPE to attach document (Second Amended Complaint) re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation (Tuvim, Mark)
July 9, 2021 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Basauri, Taryn)
July 9, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Taryn M Basauri on behalf of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Basauri, Taryn)
July 9, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Megan Uhle on behalf of Defendant Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc. (Uhle, Megan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Megan Uhle on behalf of Defendant The Nash Engineering Company. (Uhle, Megan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Matthew P. Bergman filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch re #23 MOTION to Remand (Bergman, Matthew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Vanessa J. Firnhaber Oslund filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch re #23 MOTION to Remand (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/30/2021, (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The William Powell Company (Roeder, Melissa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by P-G Industries Inc (Babbitt, Diane)
July 9, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BW/IP Inc (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 9, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christine E Dinsdale on behalf of Defendant BW/IP Inc. (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 9, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Gawlowski, Richard)
July 9, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard G Gawlowski on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Gawlowski, Richard)
July 9, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pfizer Inc (Alkhazov, Marissa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marissa Alkhazov on behalf of Defendant Pfizer Inc. (Alkhazov, Marissa)
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nash Engineering Holdings LLC, a Delaware corporation for The Nash Engineering Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Nash Engineering Company (Kopij, Dana)
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dana C Kopij on behalf of Defendant The Nash Engineering Company. (Kopij, Dana)
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Weir Group PLC, a United Kingdom company for Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc (Kopij, Dana)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dana C Kopij on behalf of Defendant Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc. (Kopij, Dana)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s), Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; by Warren Pumps LLC.(Eraut, Allen)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating Colfax Corporation as no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Warren Pumps LLC (Eraut, Allen) Modified on 7/9/2021 to reflect CP on docket (MET).
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allen Eraut on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Eraut, Allen)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew Phineas Bergman on behalf of Plaintiffs David Welch, Linda Welch. (Bergman, Matthew)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund on behalf of Plaintiffs David Welch, Linda Welch. (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa)
July 8, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/15/2021. (SG)
July 8, 2021 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SG)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe re Notice of Removal and Exhibit) by Defendant Velan Valve Corp. (Tuvim, Mark)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin J Craig on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corp.. (Craig, Kevin)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-07123-2; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7153476), filed by Velan Valve Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tuvim, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Welch
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Welch
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J Welch
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Insulations, Inc.
Represented By: David A Shaw
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Laura E Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Coast Electric Company and Warren Pumps
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc. and ITT Corporation
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation and Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P-G Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Represented By: Kyle A Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP International Inc
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale, LLC and Haskell Corporation
Represented By: Kyle A Jones
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Nicole R. MacKenzie
Represented By: Daniel Michael Finer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: James D Hicks
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company and Weir Valve & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Marissa Alkhazov
Represented By: Midori R. Sagara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.; ViacomCBS, Inc.; Spirax Sarco, Inc. and General Electric
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Represented By: Randy J Aliment
Represented By: Taryn M Basauri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: Taryn M Basauri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company; BP America, Inc.; BP Corporation of North America, Inc.; and BP Products North America, Inc.
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corp.
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries Inc
Represented By: Brittany A. Madderra
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Represented By: Lorianne Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Represented By: Brittany A. Madderra
Represented By: Lorianne Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AW Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Represented By: Lorianne Hanson
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Inc
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Corporation of North America Inc
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America Inc
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Insulations Inc
Represented By: David A Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Industrial Products
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper-Bessemer Corporation
Represented By: Brittany A. Madderra
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Represented By: Lorianne Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Represented By: Randy J Aliment
Represented By: Taryn M Basauri
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haskell Corporation
Represented By: Kyle A Jones
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Coast Electric Company
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Marissa Alkhazov
Represented By: Midori R. Sagara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P-G Industries Inc
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Represented By: Kyle A Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco Inc
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale LLC
Represented By: Kyle A Jones
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWC The Valve Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?