TicketOps Corporation v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Petitioner: TicketOps Corporation
Respondent: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00931
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SEALED MINUTE ORDER: Attached to this Minute Order is a form of judgment that is consistent with the Court's Order entered September 9, 2021, docket no. #17 . Within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order, the parties shall file any objections to the attached form of judgment and shall show cause why the judgment cannot be filed in the public record. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(MW) (cc: Counsel of record via email)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SEALED ORDER: TicketOps's petition to vacate the Award, docket no. #1 , is DENIED; Costco's petition to confirm the Award, docket no. #8 , is GRANTED, and the Award is hereby CONFIRMED in favor of Costco and against TicketOps; Costco's request to require TicketOps to post security is DENIED; The Court will enter Judgment in favor of Costco and against TicketOps in the amount of $16,597,764.66. The parties are DIRECTED to show cause within seven (7) days of the date of this Order why this Order should not be unsealed. The Court GRANTS both stipulated motions to seal, docket nos. #13 & #15 . TicketOps's reply brief and all exhibits attached thereto (docket nos. 14, 14-1, & 14-2), and Costco's reply brief (docket no. 16) shall remain UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(MW) (cc: Counsel of record via email)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply Brief in Support of its Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and Require Ticketops to Post Bond by Respondent Costco Wholesale Corporation re #13 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #15 Stipulated MOTION to Seal and [Proposed] Order (Burman, David) Modified due to event technical error, removed unrelated reference to docket 13 on 8/27/2021 (STP).
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION to Seal and [Proposed] Order, filed by Respondent Costco Wholesale Corporation. Noting Date 8/27/2021, (Burman, David)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #16 Sealed Document: modified due to event technical error, removed unrelated reference to docket #13 . (STP)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Petitioner TicketOps Corporation re #13 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #8 Sealed Document, #1 MOTION to Vacate (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Parker C. Folse III, #2 Exhibit E)(Folse, Parker)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , filed by Petitioner TicketOps Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/23/2021, (Folse, Parker)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: The parties' stipulated motion to seal, docket no. #7 , is GRANTED. The parties' stipulation for an order establishing a revised briefing schedule, docket no. #11 , is GRANTED. Petitioner shall file a single brief, not to exceed 12 pages, as both a reply in support of its Petition to Vacate (docket no. #1 ) and in opposition to Respondent's Petition to Confirm (docket no. 8) on or before August 23, 2021. Respondent shall file a single reply brief, not to exceed 12 pages, in support of its Petition to Confirm (docket no. 8) on or before August 27, 2021. Both Petitions, docket nos. #1 & 8, shall be noted on the motion calendar for August 27, 2021. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Establish Briefing Schedule, filed by Respondent Costco Wholesale Corporation, Petitioner TicketOps Corporation. Noting Date 8/6/2021, (Folse, Parker)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Burman, David)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of David J. Burman by Respondent Costco Wholesale Corporation re #7 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #8 Sealed Document, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Burman, David)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT Opposition to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award by Respondent Costco Wholesale Corporation re #7 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #1 MOTION to Vacate (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Confirming Award, #2 Proposed Order Setting Bond)(Burman, David); Noting Date 8/27/21; Modified on 8/9/2021 (SRS).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , filed by Respondent Costco Wholesale Corporation. Noting Date 8/2/2021, (Burman, David)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorneys David J. Burman, David T. Martin added for Costco Wholesale Corporation; per #8 Sealed Document. (MW)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER granting Petitioner's #3 Motion to Seal. The Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award (docket no. 1), and the exhibits attached thereto (docket nos. 1-1 - 1-8), as well as the Declaration of Parker Folse (docket no. 2), and the exhibit attached thereto (docket no. 2-1), shall remain UNDER SEAL. The Clerk is DIRECTED to UNSEAL this case and all other docket entries. The Court notes that the Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, docket no. 1, should be captioned as a "Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award," and the parties should be designated as "Petitioner" and "Respondent" accordingly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(MW)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS upon defendant Costco Whole Corporation mailed on 7/20/2021 3/17/2021. (SR) Modified on 7/21/2021 to correct mailing date (SR).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by TicketOps Corporation. (SR)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATED MOTION to Seal, filed by Plaintiff TicketOps Corp. Noting Date 7/13/2021. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Seal) (ST)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of Parker C Folse III re #1 Motion to Vacate by Plaintiff TicketOps Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ST)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award, filed by Plaintiff TicketOps Corp. Noting Date 8/6/2021. Oral Argument Requested. (Receipt# SEA104825) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit C-3, #6 Exhibit D, #7 PROPOSED Order Granting Motion, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST) Modified on 7/23/2021 (MW).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/20/2021. (copy of docket report w/CDS notice highlighted sent to plaintiff's counsel via USPS) (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TicketOps Corporation v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TicketOps Corporation
Represented By: Parker C Folse, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: David T. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?