Brown v. Superior Court of the State of Washington King County
Petitioner: Maurice Anthony Brown
Respondent: Superior Court of the State of Washington King County
Case Number: 2:2021cv00932
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 Mail addressed to Maurice Anthony Brown returned as Undeliverable/Not in Jail re #5 Order. (AMD)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO UPDATE ADDRESS AND CORRECT IFP DEFICIENCIES by Judge David W. Christel. If Petitioner fails to respond to the Notice of Filing Deficiency and fails to notify the Court of his current mailing address by 9/27/2021, the undersigned will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice. (AMD - cc: pltf)
August 23, 2021 Response to Court and Address Change due 9/27/2021, re #5 Order. (AMD)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Mail addressed to Maurice Anthony Brown returned as "Return to Sender/Attempted - Not Known/Unable to Forward" re #2 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter. (SP)
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application. ***Action Required*** 2241/2254 Not Certified.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 8/13/2021 to correct IFP application. (SP- cc: petitioner)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Petitioner Maurice Anthony Brown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Superior Court of the State of Washington King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maurice Anthony Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superior Court of the State of Washington King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?