Smith v. Uttecht
Petitioner: Alan Justin Smith
Respondent: Jeffrey Uttecht
Case Number: 2:2021cv00940
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Referring Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED 2254 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Alan Justin Smith. (Attachments: SEALED#1 PROPOSED Motion for Injunctive Relief and Temporary Restraining Order, SEALED#2 Application for Return of Children Wrongfully Removed and for Assistance in Effecting Interim Contacts and Arrangements for Organizing or Securing the Effective Exercise of Rights of Access, SEALED#3 Appendix A, SEALED#4 Appendix B, #5 Appendix C, #6 Appendix D, #7 Appendix E, SEALED#8 PROPOSED Order, #9 Letter from Filer)**143 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201)(ST)
September 9, 2021 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. **DO NOT PRINT**(Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201)(ST)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE #11 2254 PETITION AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND, by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. Amended petition is due within 30 days of the date on which this Order is signed. The Clerk is directed to SEAL Petitioner's #10 Motion for Injunctive Relief and all attached documents, pending the submission of a redacted version of his motion papers. (Attachments: #1 Amended 2254 Petition form)**19 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201)(ST)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 SEALED 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Alan Justin Smith. (Receipt # spo03861) Modified on 8/13/21. The petition should have been posted on the date the filing fee was received (7/15/21). (Attachments: SEALED #1 Appendix A, SEALED #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E)**DO NOT PRINT**(Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201)(ST)
August 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2021. **DO NOT PRINT**(Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201)(ST)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 SEALED PROPOSED Motion for Injunctive Relief and Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Petitioner Alan Justin Smith (Attachments: #1 Application for Return of Children Wrongfully Removed and for Assistance in Effecting Interim Contact and Arrangements for Organizing or Securing the Effective Exercise of Rights of Access, #2 Proposed Order)**16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201)(ST) Modified on 8/13/2021. Sealed pursuant to #12 Order. (ST)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201)(ST) Modified on 7/16/2021. Letter regenerated to petitioner. (ST)
July 15, 2021 FILING FEE RECEIVED BY WAED: $ 5.00, Receipt#: spo038619 **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201)(ST) Modified on 7/16/2021. Entry regenerated to petitioner. (ST)
July 15, 2021 Judge Marsha J. Pechman and Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201)(ST) Modified on 7/16/2021. Judge assignment entry regenerated to petitioner. (ST)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern, Case Number 4:21-cv-05103.
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING TRANSFER TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON. Case transferred to District of Western District of Washington. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201) [Transferred from waed on 7/15/2021.]
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement, filed by Alan Justin Smith. (TR, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201)[Transferred from waed on 7/15/2021.] Modified on 7/15/2021. Personal identifier redacted and document restriction removed. (ST) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/15/2021) (ST).
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by: Alan Justin Smith filed in response to deficiency letter. (TR, Case Administrator) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201) [Transferred from waed on 7/15/2021.] Modified on 7/15/2021. Document restriction removed. (ST)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit) (TR, Case Administrator) **PRINT ALL** (Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201) [Transferred from waed on 7/15/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Sealed Unredacted Petition with personal identifiers, filed by Alan Justin Smith. (TR, Case Administrator) **129 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201)[Transferred from waed on 7/15/2021.] Modified on 7/15/2021. Petition and accompanying documents filed and sealed by WAED as one document. Petition and Appendices A-B contain personal identifiers and should be sealed, pursuant to LCR 5(g)(3). Appendices A-E posted as attachments to #1 Petition with the proper security restrictions. (ST)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 SEALED 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Alan Justin Smith. (Filing fee not paid and no IFP submitted) NOTE: unredacted Petition and exhibits (129 pages) filed as a separate sealed document due to inclusion of minor's names and DOB.(TR, Case Administrator) **24 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Alan Smith, Prisoner ID: 381201) [Transferred from waed on 7/15/2021.] (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/15/2021) (ST). (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/15/2021. WAWD case number added to petition. Petition sealed as it contains personal identifiers.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2021: SEALED #1 Appendix A, SEALED#2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Request to Transfer Funds re Filing Fee) (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alan Justin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?