Pratt v. City of Seattle
Plaintiff: Janice Pratt
Defendant: City of Seattle
Case Number: 2:2021cv00985
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 10 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 9/26/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 10/20/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 3/30/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/30/2022, Discovery completed by 5/31/2022, Dispositive motions and motions challenging expert witness testimony due by 6/28/2022, Motions in Limine due by 8/29/2022, Pretrial Order due by 9/12/2022, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 9/19/2022, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 10. (Childers, Kathryn)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal . by City of Seattle.(Daily, Molly)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/6/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/13/2021, Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ST)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Janice Pratt (Moody, Rodney)
July 23, 2021 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (ST)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant City of Seattle re #2 Verification of State Court Records, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration (non motion) (Daily, Molly)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Molly Daily in Support of Notice of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant City of Seattle (Daily, Molly)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant City of Seattle (Daily, Molly)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-08277-3; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7177457), filed by City of Seattle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Daily, Molly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt v. City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Pratt
Represented By: Rodney R Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Kathryn Childers
Represented By: Molly Margaret Daily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?