Zuniga v. King County et al
Plaintiff: Albert B Zuniga
Defendant: King County, City of Seattle, Jenny Durkan, Dow Constantine, Wells Fargo Bank, Jesse Sepulveda, Jim Grona, Texas A&M University, Mark Manning, University Health System, VA Hospital, USAA Ins Company Inc, Robert C Schenk, Department of Defense, US Department of Navy, University Health Services Center, Lockheed Martin Inc, University of Texas, Google Inc, Boeing Inc, GoDaddy Inc and Navy Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 2:2021cv01030
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 24 Mail addressed to Albert Zuniga returned as Undeliverable re #23 Order Dismissing Case. (LH)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The above-captioned matter is DISMISSED. The Courthas reviewed Dkt. #7 - #11 and #17 - #19 but finds no reason to delay the dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
August 27, 2021 Filing 22 Addendum to Factual Allegations re #12 Order Requiring a More Definite Statement; filed by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. (SR)
August 27, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED RESPONSE by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga re #12 Order Requiring a More Definite Statement. (SR)
August 26, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name Filed by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. (LH) (Plaintiff address updated on docket)
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for More Time to Properly Plea/Correct Deficiencies/Appoint Counsel re #9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noted by clerk for 9/10/2021. (SR)
August 16, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Serve as Many Defendants as Possible, filed by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. Noted by Clerk for 9/3/2021. (LH)
August 16, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Accept Habeas Petition, filed by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. Noted by Clerk for 9/3/2021. (LH)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's #15 Emergency Motion for IFP Status. On 8/10/2021, plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis was granted and his complaint was accepted for filing. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail)
August 12, 2021 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION for IFP Status, filed by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. Noted by Clerk for 8/12/2021 (per chambers) (LH)
August 12, 2021 Filing 14 Second EXHIBIT re #6 Complaint by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. (LH)
August 11, 2021 Filing 13 EXHIBIT re #6 Complaint by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. (SR)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file on or before September 7, 2021, an amended complaint which clearly and concisely identifies the acts of which each named defendant is accused and how those acts violated plaintiff's legal rights. Failure to timely file an amended complaint that asserts a plausible claim for relief will result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Order Requiring More Definite Statement re #12 Order, NOTED on motion calendar for 9/10/2021. (LH)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION and Petition to Remove State Court Case, filed by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. Noted by Clerk for 8/27/2021. (LH)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. Noted by Clerk for 8/27/2021. (LH)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. Noted by Clerk for 8/10/2021. (LH)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Praecipe for Summons and Service at a Later Date, filed by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. Noted by Clerk for 8/27/2021. (LH)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend Pleadings and Defendants, filed by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga. Noted by Clerk for 8/27/2021. (LH)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Albert B Zuniga. (LH)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Albert B Zuniga. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Motion for TRO, #2 Proposed Motion to Appoint Counsel, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Petition for Removal)(LH)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid, Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 9/2/2021 to correct IFP application (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 PROPOSED Complaint filed by Plaintiff Albert B Zuniga (Attachments: #1 Motion to Amend Pleadings and Defendants, #2 Motion for Praecipe to Summons at a later date)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuniga v. King County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert B Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Durkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Sepulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Grona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas A&M University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VA Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Ins Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Schenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Health Services Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?