Flexiworld Technologies Inc v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: Flexiworld Technologies Inc
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc, Amazon Web Services Inc and Amazon.com LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01055
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David G Estudillo
Referring Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. Case reassigned to Judge David G. Estudillo. Judge Richard A. Jones no longer assigned to the case. (VE)
October 15, 2021 Filing 119 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski. Filed by Plaintiff Flexiworld Technologies Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER re #114 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles Austin Ginnings for Plaintiff Flexiworld Technologies Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 13, 2021 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bryn Resser Pallesen on behalf of Plaintiff Flexiworld Technologies Inc. (Pallesen, Bryn)
October 12, 2021 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: The Court acknowledges the requirements of FRCP 16(b), but finds good cause to defer entry of an initial case scheduling order pending its ruling the following motions: #34 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing, #74 Opposed MOTION to Stay, and #82 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing ('087, '846 and '064 Patents) (VE)
October 12, 2021 Noting Dates Set: #34 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing, #74 Opposed MOTION to Stay, and #82 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing ('087, '846 and '064 Patents) are noted for 10/15/2021, pursuant to #116 NOTICE of Pending Motions. (VE)
October 8, 2021 Filing 116 NOTICE of Pending Motions ; filed by Defendants Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc. (McCullough, Christina)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER re #113 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski for plaintiff Flexiworld Technologies Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
October 7, 2021 Filing 114 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles Austin Ginnings FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Flexiworld Technologies Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7281988 (Farmer, Tyler)
October 7, 2021 Filing 113 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Timothy E. Grochocinski FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Flexiworld Technologies Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7281833 (Farmer, Tyler)
September 14, 2021 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: The Court has reviewed the #112 NOTICE of Pending Motion for Reconsideration in the Western District of Texas. The Court acknowledges the requirements of FRCP 16(b), but finds good cause to defer entry of an initial case scheduling order and directs the parties to notify the Court immediately of the ruling on the Motion for Reconsideration. (VE)
September 9, 2021 Filing 112 NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IN THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS re #100 Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) ; filed by Plaintiff Flexiworld Technologies Inc. (Harrigan, Arthur)
September 9, 2021 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Flexiworld Technologies Inc. (Harrigan, Arthur)
September 9, 2021 Attorney Tyler Lawrence Farmer added for Flexiworld Technologies Inc; per #111 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER re #104 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ruchika Verma for Defendants Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc, and for Amazon.com Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher Kelley for Defendants Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc, and Amazon.com Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re #105 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Yesenia Flores for defendants Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com LLC and Amazon.com Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re #103 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel T Shvodian for defendants Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com LLC and Amazon.com Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER re #102 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney M. Craig Tyler for defendants Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com LLC and Amazon.com Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 19, 2021 Filing 105 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Yesenia Flores FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7215887 (McCullough, Christina)
August 19, 2021 Filing 104 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ruchika Verma FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7215882 (McCullough, Christina)
August 19, 2021 Filing 103 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel T. Shvodian FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7215862 (McCullough, Christina)
August 19, 2021 Filing 102 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY M. Craig Tyler FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7215849 (McCullough, Christina)
August 19, 2021 Filing 101 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher L. Kelley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7215820 (McCullough, Christina)
August 9, 2021 Filing 100 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Western District of Texas and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)
August 9, 2021 Filing 99 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western, Case Number 6:20-cv-00553.
August 9, 2021 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (CDA)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Sealed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 update text (CDA).
August 2, 2021 Case transferred to Western District of Washington. (bw) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 97 Redacted copy of #96 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., re #82 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing ('087, '846 and '064 Patents) filed by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc., Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc., Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. [Public Version] (Shvodian, Daniel) Modified on 7/28/2021 (lad). [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Filing 96 Sealed Document: Amazon's Reply in Support of Its Second Motion for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing ('087, '846 and '064) of #90 Sealed Document,, by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 updated text (CDA).
July 23, 2021 Filing 95 Sealed Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Amazon's Reply ISO Second Motion for Partial Dismissal, #2 Proposed Order) (Shvodian, Daniel) Motion terminated on 7/26/2021 and atty advised to filed the reply directly as a sealed document (lad). [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 correct text (CDA).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING #85 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Withdrawing Text Order on 7/22/2021. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Withdrawn per Order #94 *** Text Order MOOTING #85 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #84 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion to extend the time for Defendant to Reply. The Court notes that the date of Defendant's requested extension has passed. As such, the court moots this motion.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) Modified on 7/22/2021 (ir). [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 93 Sur-reply to Motion, filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc., re #54 Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant Amazon.com LLC, Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc., Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc., Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 92 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc., re #82 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing ('087, '846 and '064 Patents) filed by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc., Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc., Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. PUBLIC VERSION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Timothy E. Grochocinski, #2 Exhibit A- Licensed Patents v. '541 Spec)(Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 91 Sealed Document: Response in Opposition to Amazon's Second Motion for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing of #82 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing ('087, '846 and '064 Patents) by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of William Chang- Confidential and Sealed) (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 correct text (CDA).
July 16, 2021 Filing 90 Sealed Document: Response in Opposition to Amazon's Second Motion for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing ('087, '847, and '064 Patents) of #82 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing ('087, '846 and '064 Patents) by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Timothy E. Grochocinski, #2 Exhibit 2- Declaration of William Change, #3 Exhibit A- Licensed Patents v. '541 Spec) (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 correct text (CDA).
July 13, 2021 Filing 89 Sealed Unopposed Sealed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Amazons Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Declaration of Daniel T. Shvodian, #4 Sealed Document Exhibit AI - Sealed Document, #5 Sealed Document Exhibit AJ - Sealed Document, #6 Exhibit AK - Venue Interrogatories, #7 Sealed Document Exhibit AL - Sealed Document, #8 Exhibit AM - Infringement Chart, #9 Exhibit AN - LinkedIn profile, #10 Sealed Document Exhibit AO - Sealed Document, #11 Sealed Document Exhibit AP - Sealed Document, #12 Exhibit AQ - LinkedIn Profile, #13 Exhibit AR - LinkedIn Profile, #14 Exhibit AS - Article, #15 Exhibit AT - Article) (Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 updated text (CDA).
July 12, 2021 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Discovery Hearing held on 7/12/2021. The Court, upon discovering that there were outstanding dispositive motions, determined that this case will be stayed for a period of 3 weeks. During that time the Court will rule on pending motions. After the Order issued then the Court can take up any further discovery issues that are still valid. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(ab4) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER SETTING HEARING Discovery Hearing VIA ZOOM set for 7/12/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #82 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing ('087, '846 and '064 Patents) by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #84 Response in Opposition to Motion,, to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shvodian, Daniel) Modified on 7/22/2021 (ir). [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 84 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc., re #55 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc., Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc., Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Tim Thompson, #2 Exhibit 4- TI Declaration, #3 Exhibit 5- Amazon Tap Support Pages, #4 Exhibit 8- Hasty LinkedIn, #5 Exhibit 14- Dodson LinkedIn, #6 Exhibit 15- Koshy LinkedIn, #7 Exhibit 17- Wi-Fi Certification, #8 Exhibit 18- Liu LinkedIn, #9 Exhibit 19- Confluent Locations)(Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Austin Ginnings on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Ginnings, Charles) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 82 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing ('087, '846 and '064 Patents) by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel T. Shvodian, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 81 Sealed Document: Response in Opposition to Amazon's Motion to Transfer Venue Ybder 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) of #54 Sealed Motion filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2-Dec. of Tim Thompson, #3 Exhibit 3- Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4- TI Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5- Amazon Tap Support Pages, #6 Exhibit 6- Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7- Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8- Hasty LinkedIn, #9 Exhibit 9- Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 10- Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 11- Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 12- Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 13- Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit 14- Dodson LinkedIn, #15 Exhibit 15- Koshy LinkedIn, #16 Exhibit 16- Filed Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 17- Wi-Fi Certification, #18 Exhibit 18- Liu LinkedIn, #19 Exhibit 19-Confluent Locations, #20 Exhibit 20- Filed Under Seal, #21 Exhibit 21- Declaration of Timothy E. Grochocinski with Exhibits Part 1, #22 Exhibit 21- Declaration of Timothy E. Grochocinski with exhibits Part 2) (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 update text (CDA).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #78 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Noting that the requested date to extend deadlines has passed, the Court MOOTS this Motion.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #75 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiffs Motion to Allow Joseph P. Oldaker (Mr. Oldaker) to Withdraw As Counsel. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that Mr. Oldaker is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. It is further ORDERED that the docket be amended to reflect that Mr. Oldaker has withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs and that he no longer needs to be noticed of any pleadings, motions, or other documents filed or served in this case.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., re #74 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc., Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc., Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Venue Discovery) by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. for proceedings held on 9/3/2020. Proceedings Transcribed: Scheduling Conference. Court Reporter: Lily Reznik. (Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 76 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc., re #74 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc., Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc., Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Flexiworld by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oldaker, Joseph) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
May 6, 2021 Filing 74 Opposed MOTION to Stay by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Amisha K. Manek, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 73 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Griffin on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Ryan Griffin added to party Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla) (Griffin, Ryan) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan H. Rastegar on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Jonathan H. Rastegar added to party Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla) (Rastegar, Jonathan) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Nelson, III on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Edward Nelson, III added to party Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla) (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 69 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. for proceedings held on 1/29/2021. Proceedings Transcribed: Markman Hearing. Court Reporter: Lily Reznik. (Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING #64 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wright, Andrew) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; GRANTING #66 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration are Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Eric M. Albritton(Mr. Albritton) to Withdraw As Counsel and Motion to Allow Andrew J. Wright (Mr. Wright) to Withdraw As Counsel. Noting that it both Motions are unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motions. It is therefore ORDERED that Mr. Albritton and Mr. Wright are hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff. It is further ORDERED that the docket be amended to reflect that Mr. Albritton and Mr. Wright have withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiff and that they no longer needs to be noticed of any pleadings, motions, or other documents filed or served in this case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #63 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants' Motion to Allow Wing H. Liang (Mr. Liang) to Withdraw As Counsel. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that Mr. Liang is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendants. It is further ORDERED that the docket be amended to reflect that Mr. Liang has withdrawn as counsel for Defendants and that he no longer needs to be noticed of any pleadings, motions, or other documents filed or served in this case.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, [Joint Proposed] Protective Order)(Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION TO WITHDRAW WING H. LIANG AS COUNSEL by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Markman Hearing held on 1/29/2021. Case called for Markman Hearing. The Court heard the arguments regarding disputed claim terms. The defendant's have also file a motion which has previously had a hearing and the Court states that the Court will make a ruling as soon as possible. The jury trial is set for next February. The Court also reviewed his normal voir dire and jury trial procedures. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(lad) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 61 Sur-reply to Motion, filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., re #53 BRIEF by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 60 Notice of Filing Joint Claim Construction Statement by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Grochocinski, Timothy) Modified title on 1/22/2021 (lad). [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RESETTING Zoom Markman Hearing for 1/29/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 58 BRIEF regarding #57 Response, by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Rhyne Declaration)(Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 57 RESPONSE Amazon's Responsive Claim Construction Brief to #53 Brief, by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel T. Shvodian, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Affidavit Declaration of James A. Proctor JR., #8 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Samuel Russ)(Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Filing 56 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on September 3, 2020, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/7/2021, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2021, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2021, (lr) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 55 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Amisha Manek, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit AB, #31 Exhibit AC, #32 Exhibit AD, #33 Exhibit AE, #34 Exhibit AF, #35 Exhibit AG, #36 Exhibit AH)(Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 54 Sealed Amazon's Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Amisha K. Manek, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit AB, #30 Exhibit AC, #31 Exhibit AD, #32 Exhibit AE, #33 Exhibit AF, #34 Exhibit AG, #35 Exhibit AH, #36 Declaration of Ganesha Adkasthala Ganapathi Batta, #37 Declaration of Enerino Caruccio, #38 Declaration of Mukul Chandwani, #39 Declaration of T. Liu, #40 Sealed Document Declaration of Joshua Pearl, #41 Declaration of Conrad Van Bruggen, #42 Declaration of Qingyun Wei, #43 Proposed Order) (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 updated text (CDA).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #48 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk 's Office is directed to file the attached documents under seal. If it has not already done so, Amazon is ordered to file a redacted version of the sealed civil document within 7 days of this order.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 53 BRIEF by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Affidavit)(Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., re #50 Opposed MOTION to Exceed Presumptive Limit of Claim Terms for Construction filed by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc., Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc., Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 51 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc., re #50 Opposed MOTION to Exceed Presumptive Limit of Claim Terms for Construction filed by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc., Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc., Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 50 Opposed MOTION to Exceed Presumptive Limit of Claim Terms for Construction by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel T. Shvodian, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #50 Motion entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants' Motion for Leave to Exceed Presumptive Limit of Claim Terms for Construction. In their Motion, Defendants request that the Court allow Defendants to submit four (4) terms in excess of the Court's presumed limits. The Court notes that Plaintiffs opening claim construction brief is due Monday, December 7, 2020. In the interest of providing the parties with a quicker resolution of this issue, and as the Clerks office has closed for the day, the Court provides this text order in lieu of a typical written order which would not have been filed until the next business day. The Court's Order Governing Proceedings (OGP) sets a default maximum number of terms that each side may request the Court to construe without further leave of Court. For cases with more than five (5) patents-in-suit, the limit for number of claim terms to be construed is twelve (12) terms. In the instant case, there are ten (10) patents-in-suit which sets the presumed term limit at twelve (12) terms per side. Additionally, the Courts OGP allows for parties to request leave of court to exceed these presumed limits. After careful consideration of the briefs including the claim terms the Defendants intend to submit to the Court, the Court PARTIALLY GRANTS Defendants Motion for Leave to Exceed Claim Term Limits. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants be allowed to submit fourteen (14) total terms. The Court notes that all ten of the patents-in-suit are related and most claim priority to one particular patent. In their Motion, Defendants allege that ten of their sixteen requested terms should be subject to 35 USC 112(6), despite the fact that the terms do not contain means for or any nonce language. Therefore, the Courts decision to allow Defendants to argue those terms is discretionary. The Court had previously instructed the parties that each term would serve as a discrete means-plus-function analysis and, therefore, would count as an individual term. However, the Court notes that due to the number of asserted claims across the ten patents, good cause exists to allow Defendants to have two (2) terms in excess of the Courts presumed limits. IT IS SO ORDERED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
November 22, 2020 Filing 49 Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Revised Proposed Schedule by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 48 Sealed Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Amazon's Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Declaration of Amisha Manek, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X, #28 Exhibit Y, #29 Exhibit Z, #30 Exhibit AA, #31 Exhibit AB, #32 Exhibit AC, #33 Exhibit AD, #34 Exhibit AE, #35 Exhibit AF, #36 Exhibit AG, #37 Exhibit AH, #38 Sealed Document Declaration of Ganesha Adkasthala Ganapathi Batta, #39 Sealed Document Declaration of Enerino Caruccio, #40 Sealed Document Declaration of Mukul Chandwani, #41 Sealed Document Declaration of T. Liu, #42 Sealed Document Declaration of Joshua Pearl, #43 Sealed Document Declaration of Conrad Van Bruggen, #44 Sealed Document Declaration of Qingyun Wei, #45 Proposed Order) (Shvodian, Daniel)[Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 updated text (CDA).
November 17, 2020 Filing 47 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 10-29-20, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 12/8/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2021, (kd) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Updated Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Case called for a telephonic motion hearing. At issue is the Defendant's Motion for Dismissal for 4 of the patents in this case. The Court heard arguments from both side. The Court will take this under advisement and issue a written ruling as soon as possible. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(lad) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RESETTING START TIME OF HEARING, Telephone Conference set for 10/29/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RESETTING TIME OF TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING, Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
October 27, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., re #34 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing filed by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc., Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc., Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. [Redacted] (Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING, Telephone Conference set for 10/29/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 40 Sealed Amazon's Reply in Support of its Opposed Motion for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 update text (CDA).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #39 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants' Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. The Clerk 's Office is directed to file the attached document under seal.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 39 Sealed Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Reply, #2 Proposed Order) (Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 updated text (CDA).
October 20, 2020 Filing 38 Sealed Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc., re #34 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing filed by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc., Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc., Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc., #33 Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant Amazon.com LLC, Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc., Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc., Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of T. Grochocinski, #2 Exhibit V - `802 Patent, #3 Exhibit W - LOI (Filed Under Seal))(Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 updated text (CDA).
October 19, 2020 Filing 37 Sealed Response in Opposition to Amazon's Motion for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declarartion of Timothy E. Grochocinski, #2 Exhibit United States Patent, #3 Exhibit Letter of Intent) (am)[Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 update text (CDA).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #36 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk 's Office is directed to file the attached documents under seal.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 36 Sealed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document Flexiworld Response in Opposition, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy E. Grochocinski, #4 Exhibit Ex. V - 802 Patent, #5 Sealed Document Ex. W - LOI Agreement) (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 update text (CDA).
October 12, 2020 Filing 35 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on September 16, 2020, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 11/2/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2021, (lr) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 34 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal Due to Lack of Standing by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel T. Shvodian, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, Under Seal, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit 0, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Proposed Order)(Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 33 Sealed AMAZONS OPPOSED MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL DUE TO LACK OF STANDING (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 DECLARATION OF DANIEL T. SHVODIAN, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U) (am) (Main Document 33 replaced on 10/5/2020) (am). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/5/2020) (am). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/5/2020) (am). [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 updated text (CDA).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #32 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk 's Office is directed to file the attached documents under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 32 Sealed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order Exhibit 2, #4 Affidavit Exhibit 3, Declaration of Daniel Shvodian, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Sealed Document Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U) (Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 updated text (CDA).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 3/19/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2021. Motions due by 11/12/2021. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 2/7/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. for proceedings held on 09/16/2020. Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter: Lily Reznik. (Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 29 Proposed Scheduling Order Joint by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Telephone Conference held on 9/16/2020. Case set for Telephonic Discovery Hearing. The defendant's counsel stated their issues and the Courtheard argument regarding them. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER, Telephone Conference set for 9/16/2020 01:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #26 Motion for Discovery entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Amazon's Unopposed Motion for Discovery of License and Assignment Agreements. The Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that within seven days of this Order Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. shall produce to Amazon all license and assignment agreements related to any Flexiworld patents and/or patent applications, including all agreements relating to patents and/or patent applications currently owned or previously owned by Flexiworld or to which Flexiworld otherwise has or had rights. However, the foregoing does not require Flexiworld to produce all assignments from the named inventors on the Flexiworld patents to Flexiworld. Flexiworld may designate its production with an appropriate confidentiality designation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Discovery of License and Assignment Agreements by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Scheduling Conference held on 9/3/2020. Case called for a telephonic Scheduling Conference. The defendants want to let the Court know that they are going to be filing a motion to transfer case to Western District of Washington and a motion as to jurisdiction - they asked the Court which it would prefer first and the Court stated the jurisdiction motion first. There will also be an unopposed Motion requesting discovery order. The Court asks the defendant to file a motion with an agreed order and the Court will sign. The Court indicated it would not change the schedule right now and if things go too long the Court will move dates if necessary and depending on the Court's ruling regarding the jurisdiction and transfer motions. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(lad) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.] Modified on 8/9/2021 updated text (CDA). Modified 8/11/21 updated text (CDA).
September 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Designation of Lead Counsel by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING MARKMAN HEARING, Markman Hearing set for 2/5/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE, Telephone Conference set for 9/3/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Readiness by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Oldaker, Joseph) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc..(Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Shvodian, Daniel) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
August 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
August 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
August 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Craig Tyler for Stevan R. Stark ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13809783) by on behalf of Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Craig Tyler for Theresa H. Nguyen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13809750) by on behalf of Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Craig Tyler for Christina J. McCullough ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13809722) by on behalf of Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants' Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendants shall have up to and including August 17, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Craig Tyler on behalf of Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Craig Tyler for Amisha Manek ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13761945) by on behalf of Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Craig Tyler for Wing H. Liang ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13761922) by on behalf of Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Craig Tyler for Daniel T. Shvodian ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13761882) by on behalf of Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Tyler, M.)[Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tyler, M.) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 24, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. Judge Alan D Albright no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc.. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Amazon Web Services, Inc.. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Albritton, Eric) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric M. Albritton Timothy E. Grochocinski ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13687397) by on behalf of Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Albritton, Eric) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13686228), filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Civil Cover Sheet)(Albritton, Eric) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) [Transferred from txwd on 8/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flexiworld Technologies Inc v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flexiworld Technologies Inc
Represented By: Andrew Wright
Represented By: C. Austin Ginnings
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Edward R Nelson, III
Represented By: Eric Miller Albritton
Represented By: Jonathan H. Rastegar
Represented By: Joseph Paul Oldaker
Represented By: Ryan Griffin
Represented By: Timothy E. Grochocinski
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Amisha Manek
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Christina J McCullough
Represented By: Daniel T Shvodian
Represented By: M. Craig Tyler
Represented By: Stevan Richard Stark, Jr.
Represented By: Theresa H Nguyen
Represented By: Wing Hay Liang
Represented By: Christopher Kelley
Represented By: Ruchika Verma
Represented By: Yesenia Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services Inc
Represented By: Amisha Manek
Represented By: Christina J McCullough
Represented By: Daniel T Shvodian
Represented By: M. Craig Tyler
Represented By: Stevan Richard Stark, Jr.
Represented By: Theresa H Nguyen
Represented By: Wing Hay Liang
Represented By: Christopher Kelley
Represented By: Ruchika Verma
Represented By: Yesenia Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services Inc
Represented By: Amisha Manek
Represented By: Christina J McCullough
Represented By: Daniel T Shvodian
Represented By: M. Craig Tyler
Represented By: Stevan Richard Stark, Jr.
Represented By: Theresa H Nguyen
Represented By: Wing Hay Liang
Represented By: Christopher Kelley
Represented By: Ruchika Verma
Represented By: Yesenia Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com LLC
Represented By: Amisha Manek
Represented By: Christina J McCullough
Represented By: Daniel T Shvodian
Represented By: M. Craig Tyler
Represented By: Stevan Richard Stark, Jr.
Represented By: Theresa H Nguyen
Represented By: Wing Hay Liang
Represented By: Yesenia Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?