First American Title Insurance Company v. Northwest Title Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: First American Title Insurance Company
Defendant: Northwest Title Company LLC dba NexTitle, Northwest Title LLC dba NexTitle, Northwest Title Company LLC a Washington limited liability company doing business as NexTitle and Northwest Title LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as NexTitle
Case Number: 2:2021cv01057
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Bench Trial is set for 10/24/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *3-4 days*. Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/27/2022, Motions due by 5/27/2022, Discovery completed by 6/27/2022, Dispositive motions due by 7/26/2022, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/9/2022, Motions in Limine due by 9/26/2022, Pretrial Order due by 10/12/2022, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/19/2022, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 10/19/2022. (LC)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 3-4. Filed by Plaintiff First American Title Insurance Company.(Asher, Adam)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Reality in Motion, LLC for Northwest Title LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Title LLC (Fandel, Kent)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kent Michael Fandel on behalf of Defendant Northwest Title LLC. (Fandel, Kent)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Kent Michael Fandel added to party Northwest Title LLC(pty:dft) by Northwest Title LLC.(Fandel, Kent)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/13/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/20/2021. (LC)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Northwest Title Company LLC, Northwest Title LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(RE)
August 11, 2021 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent First American Financial Corporation for First American Title Insurance Company, Blackrock Inc, and The Vanguard Group. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by First American Title Insurance Company (Asher, Adam) Modified on 8/11/2021 to add affiliates. (RE)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7201443) Attorney Adam R. Asher added to party First American Title Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Asher, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First American Title Insurance Company v. Northwest Title Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam R. Asher
Represented By: Kevin Clifford Eggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Title Company LLC dba NexTitle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Title LLC dba NexTitle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Title Company LLC a Washington limited liability company doing business as NexTitle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Title LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as NexTitle
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?