M.S. et al v. Med-Data Inc
Plaintiff: M.S. and D.H.
Defendant: Med-Data Inc
Interested Party: Nicole Tokarski
Case Number: 2:2021cv01059
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 25 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Med-Data Inc (Palumbo, Ralph)
September 30, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #20 Answer to Complaint. ***Action Required*** Jury Demand Improperly Indicated.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MW)
September 30, 2021 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Thomas J. Birchfield filed by Defendant Med-Data Inc re #21 MOTION to Change Venue Re Forum Non Conveniens (Palumbo, Ralph)
September 30, 2021 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Ralph H. Palumbo filed by Defendant Med-Data Inc re #21 MOTION to Change Venue Re Forum Non Conveniens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Palumbo, Ralph)
September 30, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Change Venue Re Forum Non Conveniens (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/22/2021, (Palumbo, Ralph)
September 30, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Med-Data Inc.(Palumbo, Ralph)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Marjorie Nicol for defendant Med-Data Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(STP)
September 20, 2021 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: The Court acknowledges the requirements of FRCP 16(b), but finds good cause to defer entry of an initial case scheduling order pending the Court's ruling on the MOTION for Consolidation and Appointment of Interim Class Counsel in Tokarski v. Med-Data, Inc., No. 2:21-cv-00631-RAJ. (VE)
September 17, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent FH MD Holdings LLC for Med-Data Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Med-Data Inc (Palumbo, Ralph)
September 17, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Marjorie C. Nicol FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Med-Data Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7254153 (Palumbo, Ralph)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kent Adams FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Med-Data Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7254146 (Palumbo, Ralph)
September 17, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ralph H Palumbo on behalf of Defendant Med-Data Inc. (Palumbo, Ralph)
September 17, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lynn M Engel on behalf of Defendant Med-Data Inc. (Engel, Lynn)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Interim Class Counsel ; filed by Interested Party Nicole Tokarski. (Terrell, Beth)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Plaintiffs Lucy McShane for D.H., and M.S., by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Maureen M Brady for Plaintiffs D.H., and M.S., by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lucy McShane FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs D.H., M.S. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7219416 (Ide, Matthew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Maureen Brady FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs D.H., M.S. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7219387 (Ide, Matthew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance ; filed by Plaintiffs D.H., M.S.. (Ide, Matthew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 PRAECIPE to attach document (Waiver of the Service of Summons) re #6 Waiver of Service by Plaintiffs D.H., M.S. (Federman, William)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant All Defendants, mailed on 8/1/2021 (Federman, William) Modified on 8/23/2021 - document blank, counsel will refile (MET). Modified to add mailing date on 8/24/2021 (MW).
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 19, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney William B Federman for Plaintiffs D.H., and for M.S., by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY William B. Federman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs D.H., M.S. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7202894 (Ide, Matthew)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00631, by Plaintiffs D.H., M.S.. (Ide, Matthew)
August 10, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CDA)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Med-Data Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7201626) Attorney Matthew James Ide added to party D.H.(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew James Ide added to party M.S.(pty:pla), filed by M.S., D.H.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ide, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.S. et al v. Med-Data Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.
Represented By: Matthew James Ide
Represented By: Lucy McShane
Represented By: Maureen M Brady
Represented By: William B Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.H.
Represented By: Matthew James Ide
Represented By: Lucy McShane
Represented By: Maureen M Brady
Represented By: William B Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med-Data Inc
Represented By: Marjorie Nicol
Represented By: Lynn M Engel
Represented By: Ralph H Palumbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nicole Tokarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?