Camacho v. PeopleConnect Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jose Medina Camacho
Defendant: PeopleConnect, Inc., TruthFinder LLC and PeopleConnect Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01076
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Jose Medina Camacho (Stephens, Kim)
October 8, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated without prejudice, pursuant to Plaintiff's #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (TF)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin Abramowicz for Plaintiff Jose Medina Camacho, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin W Tucker for plaintiff Jose Medina Camacho, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin Tucker FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jose Medina Camacho (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7214591 (Shiel, Cecily)
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin Abramowicz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jose Medina Camacho (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7214582 (Shiel, Cecily)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin Scott Thomassen for Plaintiff Jose Medina Camacho, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ari J. Scharg for Plaintiff Jose Medina Camacho, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin H Richman for Plaintiff Jose Medina Camacho, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin Thomassen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jose Medina Camacho (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7212908 (Shiel, Cecily)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ari Scharg FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jose Medina Camacho (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7212905 (Shiel, Cecily)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin H. Richman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jose Medina Camacho (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7212901 (Shiel, Cecily)
August 17, 2021 Case Reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour as related to 2:21-cv-01074-JCC. Judge Richard A. Jones no longer assigned to the case. (VE)
August 17, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (GT)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01074, 2:21-cv-01075, by Plaintiff Jose Medina Camacho. (Shiel, Cecily)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) PeopleConnect Inc, TruthFinder LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CDA)
August 13, 2021 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (CDA)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7205169), filed by Jose Medina Camacho. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Shiel, Cecily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camacho v. PeopleConnect Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Medina Camacho
Represented By: Cecily C Shiel
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Ari J. Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H Richman
Represented By: Benjamin Scott Thomassen
Represented By: Cecily Jordan
Represented By: Kevin Abramowicz
Represented By: Kevin W Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PeopleConnect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TruthFinder LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PeopleConnect Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?