Robinson v. Delapejia et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Robinson
Defendant: Manuel Delapena, Pete Carlson and Manuel Delapejia
Case Number: 2:2021cv01094
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION of David James filed by Defendant Manuel Delapena re #17 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Koven, Cassondra)
October 5, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Manuel Delapena. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/29/2021, (Koven, Cassondra)
October 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Cassondra Koven. Filed by Defendant Manuel Delapena. (Koven, Cassondra)
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER from Barbara Robinson filed by Barbara Robinson. (SR)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Defendant Pete Carlson's #12 Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. The amended complaint must: (1) set forth Plaintiff's factual allegations without accompanying legal argument in discrete numbered paragraphs; (2) set forth Plaintiff's legal claims against each named Defendant; and (3) specify the factual allegations relevant to each claim against each named Defendant. The Court will use the correct spelling "Delapena" going forward for Defendant Manual Delapena. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR) (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. mail)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY, filed by Defendant Pete Carlson, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION for More Definite Statement (Johnston, Abigail)
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for More Definite Statement , filed by Defendant Pete Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/17/2021, (Johnston, Abigail)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Abigail B Johnston on behalf of Defendant Pete Carlson. (Johnston, Abigail)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Manuel Delapejia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(McCormick, Cassondra)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/3/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/10/2022, Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2022. Cc to plaintiff and pro se defendant via US Mail. (GT)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 In light of the current General Order restricting courtroom capacity to 25 people due to the highly contagious delta variant of the COVID-19 virus, the Status Conference in this matter is hereby stricken. The parties will be directed by separate entry to meet and confer and submit a joint status report. Cc to plaintiff and pro se defendant via US Mail.(GT)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER granting Government's #6 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. The deadline for the United States to answer or respond to the complaint is October 19, 2021. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR) (cc: Barbara Robinson and Pete Carlson via U.S. mail)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond, filed by Defendant Manuel Delapejia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/20/2021, (McCormick, Cassondra)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Gabriel_Traber@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. CC to Plaintiff and Defendant Carlson via US Mail. (GT)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. CC to Plaintiff and Defendant Carlson via US Mail. (GT)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Small Claims Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)cc plaintiff and defendant Carlson via US Mail
August 17, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CDA)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Small Claims Court, case number 21-civ-30400; (), filed by Manuel Delapena. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormick, Cassondra) (No Fee Required)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Delapejia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Delapena
Represented By: Cassondra McCormick
Represented By: Cassondra Koven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Carlson
Represented By: Abigail B Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Delapejia
Represented By: Cassondra Koven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?