Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc v Corning Optical Communications Inc
Plaintiff: Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc. and Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc
Defendant: Corning Optical Communications LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01102
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc (Calfo, Angelo)
October 12, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated per Plaintiff's #27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (AD)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 11/9/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/19/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/2/2021. (AD)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew Goldsmith for defendant Corning Optical Communications LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John Thorne for Defendant Corning Optical Communications LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 8, 2021 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Hon. S. Kate Vaughan no longer assigned to case. (KMP)
September 8, 2021 Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew E. Goldsmith FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Corning Optical Communications LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7241703 (McBrayer, Ryan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John Thorne FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Corning Optical Communications LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7241665 (McBrayer, Ryan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/15/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
September 2, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan McBrayer on behalf of Defendant Corning Optical Communications LLC. (McBrayer, Ryan)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CORNING OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS LLC'S UNOPPOSED #16 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan; Corning Optical Communications LLC answer due 10/12/2021. (TF)
September 2, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Corning Incorporated for Corning Optical Communications LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Corning Optical Communications LLC (McBrayer, Ryan)
September 1, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Corning Optical Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/1/2021, (McBrayer, Ryan)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael J DeStefano for Plaintiff Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Corning Optical Communications LLC on 8/20/2021, filed by Plaintiff Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc. (Calfo, Angelo)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric W Lin for Plaintiff Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Veronica Ascarrunz for Plaintiff Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc. (Calfo, Angelo)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stefani E Shanberg for plaintiff Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Veronica S. Ascarrunz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7217178 (Calfo, Angelo)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stefani E. Shanberg FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7217155 (Calfo, Angelo)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael J. DeStefano FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7217144 (Calfo, Angelo)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric W. Lin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7217136 (Calfo, Angelo)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Corning Optical Communications LLC (AQ)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS in a Civil Action by Plaintiff Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc (Calfo, Angelo)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (CDA)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Copyright/Patent/Trademark Forms Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
August 18, 2021 Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (CDA)
August 18, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/25/2021. (CDA)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against defendant(s) Corning Optical Communications LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7212132), filed by Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Calfo, Angelo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc v Corning Optical Communications Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Eric W Lin
Represented By: Michael J DeStefano
Represented By: Stefani E Shanberg
Represented By: Veronica Ascarrunz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corning Optical Communications LLC
Represented By: Andrew Goldsmith
Represented By: John Thorne
Represented By: Ryan McBrayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?