Ho v. Arctic Storm Management Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Ho
Defendant: Arctic Storm Management Group LLC and Arctic Fjord Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01103
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4. (Williams, Douglas)
September 1, 2021 Attorney Nathan John Beard added for Arctic Fjord Inc, Arctic Storm Management Group LLC; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (SR)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Arctic Fjord Inc, Arctic Storm Management Group LLC.(Bratz, David)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Oyang Corporation, Corporate Parent Arctic Storm Holding Company, LLC for Arctic Fjord Inc, Arctic Storm Management Group LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Arctic Fjord Inc, Arctic Storm Management Group LLC (Bratz, David)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Carl Bratz on behalf of Defendants Arctic Fjord Inc, Arctic Storm Management Group LLC. (Bratz, David)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Arctic Fjord, Inc. on 8/25/2021, filed by Plaintiff Steven Ho. (Williams, Douglas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Arctic Storm Management Group, LLC on 8/25/2021, filed by Plaintiff Steven Ho. (Williams, Douglas)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 In light of the current General Order restricting courtroom capacity to 25 people due to the highly contagious delta variant of the COVID-19 virus, the Status Conference in this matter is hereby stricken. The parties will be directed by separate entry to meet and confer and submit a joint status report.(GT)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Gabriel_Traber@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 12/7/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Arctic Fjord Inc, Arctic Storm Management Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(RE)
August 18, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (RE)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Personal Injuries against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Douglas Ralph Williams added to party Steven Ho(pty:pla), filed by Steven Ho. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Williams, Douglas) (Prepayment Waived) Modified on 8/18/2021 to edit payment info. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ho v. Arctic Storm Management Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ho
Represented By: Douglas Ralph Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arctic Storm Management Group LLC
Represented By: David Carl Bratz
Represented By: Nathan John Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arctic Fjord Inc
Represented By: David Carl Bratz
Represented By: Nathan John Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?