Bungie Inc v. Bansal et al
Plaintiff: Bungie Inc
Defendant: Kunal Bansal doing business as Lavicheats.com and Does 1-30
Case Number: 2:2021cv01111
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Plaintiff's ex parte motion, docket no. #12 , for extension is GRANTED. The Court hereby EXTENDS the following deadlines: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/4/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/18/2021, Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2021. (TKL)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report Deadlines, filed by Plaintiff Bungie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/23/2021, (Lay, Stacia)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kunal Bansal on 9/23/2021, filed by Plaintiff Bungie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lay, Stacia)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service of Summons and Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SB)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Stacia N. Lay filed by Plaintiff Bungie Inc re #7 MOTION Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service of Summons and Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lay, Stacia)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Allison Nixon filed by Plaintiff Bungie Inc re #7 MOTION Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service of Summons and Complaint (Lay, Stacia)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Plaintiff Bungie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service) Noting Date 9/17/2021, (Lay, Stacia)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Kunal Bansal (MW)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joint Status Report due by 10/18/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/4/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/18/2021. (SRS)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (CDA)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (CDA)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (CDA)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATEMENT Corporate of Disclosures by Plaintiff Bungie Inc (Lay, Stacia) Modified on 8/19/2021 Corporate parent NetEase Corporation (CDA).
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Bungie, Inc., a Delaware Corporation Kunal Bansal, Does 1-30 with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7214099), filed by Bungie, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Summons, #8 Copyright Report, #9 Trademark Report, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lay, Stacia) Modified on 8/18/2021 correct name of defendant in docket text (CDA). (Attachment 10 replaced on 8/18/2021) Problem PDF, flattened to prevent technical issues. (JF). Modified on 8/19/2021 add jury demand (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bungie Inc v. Bansal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bungie Inc
Represented By: Stacia N Lay
Represented By: Venkat Balasubramani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kunal Bansal doing business as Lavicheats.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?