Kriley v. Browne et al
Plaintiff: Alena Kriley
Defendant: Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer, Unknown Does and All Women's Care
Case Number: 2:2021cv01176
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge John H. Chun; Length of Trial: *4-6 days*. Jury Trial is set for 9/23/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/26/2024, Discovery Motions due by 3/27/2024, Discovery completed by 4/26/2024, Dispositive motions due by 5/28/2024, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 7/25/2024, Motions in Limine due by 8/12/2024, Pretrial Order due by 9/3/2024, Deposition Designations due by 9/4/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/16/2024, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/16/2024. (AD)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #81 Motion to Reset Trial Dates and Related Deadlines. Trial in this matter is set for 9/23/2024. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to issue a minute order setting trial date and related dates. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
October 24, 2023 Filing 82 RESPONSE, by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer, to #81 MOTION to Continue trial dates and pretrial deadlines. (Reppart, Kimberly)
October 23, 2023 Filing 81 MOTION to Continue trial dates and pretrial deadlines, filed by All Plaintiffs. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/3/2023, (Kriley, Alena)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge John H. Chun; Length of Trial: *4-6 days*. Jury Trial is set for 5/20/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/23/2023, Discovery Motions due by 11/22/2023, Discovery completed by 12/22/2023, Dispositive motions due by 1/22/2024, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 3/21/2024, Motions in Limine due by 4/8/2024, Pretrial Order due by 4/29/2024, Deposition Designations due by 5/1/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. Trial briefs to be submitted by 5/13/2024, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 5/13/2024. (AD)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re Defendant's #77 Motion to Compel Provider Records Pursuant to FRCP 45 and to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines. The Court DENIES the motion to compel without prejudice. The Court GRANTS Defendants' request for a trial continuance, which is unopposed. See LCR 7(b)(2). The new trial date is 5/20/2024. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
September 12, 2023 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Nicole T. Morrow filed by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer re #77 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Motion to Compel Provider Records Pursuant to FRCP 45 and To Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines (Morrow, Nicole)
September 12, 2023 Filing 77 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Motion to Compel Provider Records Pursuant to FRCP 45 and To Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines, filed by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/22/2023, (Morrow, Nicole)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #72 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
May 12, 2023 Filing 75 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley, TO RESPONSE to #72 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kriley, Alena)
May 8, 2023 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Kimberly Reppart in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Written Objections to Subpoenas and Notices of Intent to Subpoena Plaintiff's Healthcare-Medical Records and Motion to Quash Subpoenas filed by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer re #72 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas (Reppart, Kimberly)
May 8, 2023 Filing 73 RESPONSE, by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer, to #72 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reppart, Kimberly)
April 11, 2023 Filing 72 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit Exhibit F, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/12/2023, (Kriley, Alena)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #68 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Objections. Plaintiff shall have until 4/11/2023, to serve objections or seek a protective order in connection with the subpoenas at issue. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
March 20, 2023 Filing 70 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley, TO RESPONSE to #68 MOTION for Extension of Time to serve objections to Notice of Intend to Subpoena records or to file for protective order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kriley, Alena)
March 20, 2023 Noting Date Set/Reset re Plaintiff's #68 MOTION for Extension of Time to serve objections to Notice of Intend to Subpoena records or to file for protective order. Re-noted by clerk for 3/31/2023. (SB)
March 17, 2023 Filing 69 RESPONSE, by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer, to #68 MOTION for Extension of Time to serve objections to Notice of Intend to Subpoena records or to file for protective order. (Morrow, Nicole)
March 17, 2023 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to serve objections to Notice of Intend to Subpoena records or to file for protective order, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/31/2023 3/17/2023, (Kriley, Alena) Modified on 3/20/2023 (SB).
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #62 Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
February 17, 2023 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Alena Kriley filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley re #62 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F1, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Kriley, Alena)
February 17, 2023 Filing 65 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley, TO RESPONSE to #62 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C1, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F1, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G, #12 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kriley, Alena)
February 14, 2023 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Nicole T. Morrow filed by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer re #62 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Morrow, Nicole)
February 14, 2023 Filing 63 RESPONSE, by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer, to #62 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morrow, Nicole)
January 25, 2023 Filing 62 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/17/2023, (Kriley, Alena)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge John H. Chun; Length of Trial: *4-6 days*. Jury Trial is set for 3/11/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/13/2023, Discovery Motions due by 10/13/2023, Discovery completed by 11/13/2023, Dispositive motions due by 12/12/2023, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 1/11/2024, Motions in Limine due by 1/29/2024, Pretrial Order due by 2/20/2024, Deposition Designations due by 2/21/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/4/2024, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/4/2024. (AD)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge John H. Chun granting the parties' #59 Joint Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines. Trial is continued to 3/11/2024. The Clerk is directed to enter a new scheduling order. (AD)
January 10, 2023 Filing 59 Stipulated MOTION Joint Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines, filed by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/10/2023, (Morrow, Nicole)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER striking as moot Defendant's #16 Motion to Dismiss the Original Complaint. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
September 8, 2022 Filing 57 ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint, Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint by All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer.(Morrow, Nicole)
August 18, 2022 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alena Kriley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Kriley, Alena)
July 30, 2022 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jamie Phifer on 7/16/2022, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. (Kriley, Alena)
July 28, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer. (Morrow, Nicole)
July 5, 2022 Filing 53 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Jamie Phifer (SB)
July 1, 2022 Filing 52 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to serve Jamie Phifer by Plaintiff Alena Kriley (Attachments: #1 Summons Alias Summons)(Kriley, Alena)
June 28, 2022 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Pavel Horbach filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley re #35 MOTION for Ruling that Defendant Jamie Phifer was served re #29 Declaration (non motion), #26 Response to Motion, #14 Joint Status Report, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care (Kriley, Alena)
June 28, 2022 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Alena Kriley filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley re #35 MOTION for Ruling that Defendant Jamie Phifer was served re #29 Declaration (non motion), #26 Response to Motion, #14 Joint Status Report, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care (Kriley, Alena)
June 28, 2022 Filing 49 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley, TO RESPONSE to #35 MOTION for Ruling that Defendant Jamie Phifer was served re #29 Declaration (non motion), #26 Response to Motion, #14 Joint Status Report, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kriley, Alena)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's #35 Motion regarding service of process on Defendant Jamie Phifer. Plaintiff may have until July 29, 2022 to serve Defendant Phifer with process. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (LH)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #34 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge John H. Chun.(SB)
June 24, 2022 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Alena Kriley in Support of #45 Reply to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Email Receipt) (SB) (Filing received via email 6/24/2022, during CM/ECF outage)
June 24, 2022 Filing 45 REPLY filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley TO RESPONSE to #34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Email Receipt) (SB) (Filing received via email 6/24/2022, during CM/ECF outage)
June 21, 2022 Filing 44 RESPONSE, by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer, to #34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Morrow, Nicole)
June 21, 2022 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Nicole T. Morrow filed by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer re #35 MOTION for Ruling that Defendant Jamie Phifer was served re #29 Declaration (non motion), #26 Response to Motion, #14 Joint Status Report, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care (Morrow, Nicole)
June 21, 2022 Filing 42 RESPONSE, by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer, to #35 MOTION for Ruling that Defendant Jamie Phifer was served re #29 Declaration (non motion), #26 Response to Motion, #14 Joint Status Report, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care. (Morrow, Nicole)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #32 Motion to Strike Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
June 17, 2022 Filing 40 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley, TO RESPONSE to #32 CROSS MOTION re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kriley, Alena)
June 13, 2022 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Jamie Phifer filed by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer re #32 CROSS MOTION re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Morrow, Nicole)
June 13, 2022 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Nicole T. Morrow filed by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer re #32 CROSS MOTION re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Morrow, Nicole)
June 13, 2022 Filing 37 RESPONSE, by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer, to #32 CROSS MOTION re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morrow, Nicole)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #33 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (SB)
June 7, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION for Ruling that Defendant Jamie Phifer was served re #29 Declaration (non motion), #26 Response to Motion, #14 Joint Status Report, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, #10 Summons Returned Executed, #31 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Amended Affidavit of Service, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/24/2022, (Kriley, Alena)
June 6, 2022 REFERRING #33 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to: Judge S. Kate Vaughan. (AD)
June 4, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Forma Pauperis, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/24/2022, (Kriley, Alena)
June 4, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Alena Kriley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kriley, Alena)
June 2, 2022 Filing 32 CROSS MOTION re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Amended Proof of Service, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/17/2022, (Kriley, Alena)
June 2, 2022 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jamie Phifer on 11/23/2021, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. (Kriley, Alena)
June 1, 2022 Filing 30 SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kriley, Alena)
June 1, 2022 Filing 29 DECLARATION in support of Plaintiff's Surreply and Motion to Strike and other filings of Alena Kriley (Plaintiff) by Plaintiff Alena Kriley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint status Report, #2 Exhibit Search of Jamie Phifer, #3 Exhibit Search od Jamie Phifer, #4 Exhibit Amended Return of Service)(Kriley, Alena)
May 27, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Intent to file Surreply re #27 Reply to Response to Motion, ; filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. (Kriley, Alena)
May 27, 2022 Filing 27 REPLY, filed by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Morrow, Nicole)
May 23, 2022 Filing 26 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Alena Kriley, to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kriley, Alena)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #24 Second Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
May 19, 2022 Filing 24 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file opposition to Rule 12(b)(6) Motion, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) Noting Date 5/19/2022, (Kriley, Alena)
May 18, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley, TO RESPONSE to #18 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kriley, Alena)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's #18 Motion for Extension of Time under Rule 6(B)(1)(B). The Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #16 ) is re-noted for 5/27/2022. Accordingly, under LCR 7, Plaintiff's opposition is due on or before 5/23/2022. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
May 17, 2022 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Nicole T. Morrow filed by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer re #18 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time (Morrow, Nicole)
May 17, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE, by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer, to #18 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morrow, Nicole)
May 16, 2022 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER entered upon the authority of Judge John H. Chun re: Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. #18 ). The Court DIRECTS Defendants to file a response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion (Dkt. #18 ) by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, May 17, 2022. (AD)
May 16, 2022 Filing 18 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/16/2022, (Kriley, Alena)
May 16, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE: Plaintiff Alena Kriley has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (STP)
April 26, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer and All Women's Care's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/20/2022, 5/27/2022 (Morrow, Nicole) Modified on 5/18/2022 (SB).
April 11, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge John H. Chun. Judge Ricardo S. Martinez no longer assigned to the case. [notice to pro se plaintiff via regular mail] (LC)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Jury Trial is set for 7/10/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *4-6 days*. Joinder of Parties due by 5/4/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/11/2023, Motions due by 2/10/2023, Discovery completed by 3/13/2023, Dispositive motions due by 4/11/2023, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 5/26/2023, Motions in Limine due by 6/12/2023, Pretrial Order due by 6/28/2023, Trial briefs to be submitted by 7/5/2023, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 7/5/2023. [Copy of order sent to pro se plaintiff via first-class mail.] (LC) .
March 28, 2022 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4-6. (Reppart, Kimberly)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER Resetting Deadlines: Pursuant to request by pro se plaintiff (unopposed by defense counsel),Initial Disclosure Deadline is continued to 3/21/2022, and Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2022. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LC) [pro se plaintiff advised via telephone] (LC).
February 17, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to request by pro se plaintiff in this matter, the following deadline are reset by the Court: Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/7/2022, Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2022. (LC)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/7/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/14/2022. [Order sent to pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (LC)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. On 12/17/2021, this Court issued an Order to Show Cause directing Plaintiff to file a response regarding timely service of Defendants. Dkt. #6 . Counsel for Defendants have since appeared with service of summons and complaint return executed entered on 1/3/2022. The Court therefore STRIKES its previous Order to Show Cause. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Charlie Browne on 11/23/2021 (SB)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Jamie Phifer on 11/23/2021 (SB)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Unknown Name at All Women's Care (SB)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant All Women's Care on 11/23/2021. (SB)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kimberly Reppart on behalf of Defendants All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Jamie Phifer. (Reppart, Kimberly)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STRICKEN per Minute Order dated 1/7/2022 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court hereby finds and ORDERS that Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff's failure to file this Response will result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB) (cc: plaintiff via USPS) Modified on 1/7/2022 (SB).
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 Summons(es) Issued in Paper Form as to defendant(s) All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Unknown Does, Jamie Phifer due to voluminous number of summons(es) filed. (MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to Plaintiff re summons. (PM) cc: letter and blank summonses sent to Plaintiff via USPS
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT, filed by Alena Kriley against defendant(s) All Women's Care, Charlie Browne, Unknown Does, Jamie Phifer. (Receipt # SEA105231) (Summons(es) not received to issue) (ST)
September 1, 2021 IFP deficiency corrected (ST)
September 1, 2021 FILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 402.00, receipt number SEA105231 (copy of receipt emailed to plaintiff) (ST)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 9/30/2021 to correct IFP application. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 PROPOSED Complaint filed by Plaintiff Alena Kriley. (NO IFP/NO FILING FEE) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Email from Filer)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kriley v. Browne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alena Kriley
Represented By: E-Filing/Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Browne
Represented By: Kimberly Reppart
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Phifer
Represented By: Kimberly Reppart
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Women's Care
Represented By: Kimberly Reppart
Represented By: Nicole Theresa Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?