Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust et al v. Fargo Electrical Inc et al
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust and Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust
Defendant: Raymond Restrepo, Fargo Electrical Inc, Raymond Parson, Clayton Griffin, David Parsons, Raymond Parsons, Raymond Joseph Parsons and Joseph Parsons
Case Number: 2:2021cv01191
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1131 ERISA - Collection of Delinquent Trust Fun
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2022 Filing 16 DEFAULT JUDGMENT: Plaintiffs' motion, docket no. #13 , is GRANTED, and default judgment is hereby ENTERED in favor of Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, and Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust against defendant Fargo Electrical Inc., UBI No. 604568927, in the following amounts: (i) $7,764.40 in unpaid contributions, (ii) $931.73 in liquidated damages, (iii) $1,849.42 in prejudgment interest, (iv) $3,090.00 in attorneys' fees,and (v) $649.00 in costs, all for a total of $14,284.55, which amount shall bear interest at the rate of three and twenty-eight hundredths percent (3.28%) per annum from the date of Plaintiffs' motion, 8/12/2022, until paid in full, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1961. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SR)
August 12, 2022 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Noelle Dwarzski filed by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust re #13 MOTION for Default Judgment (Dwarzski, Noelle)
August 12, 2022 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Rose Pelletier filed by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust re #13 MOTION for Default Judgment (Dwarzski, Noelle)
August 12, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment , filed by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment) Noting Date 8/12/2022, (Dwarzski, Noelle)
August 12, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Raymond Restrepo, filed by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file, on or before 8/12/2022, either (i) a motion for default judgment, or (ii) a status report indicating why such motion cannot or will not be filed and whether this case may be dismissed without prejudice and without costs. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Clerk Ravi Subramanian granting #8 Motion for Default by Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust and the Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust. Default entered against Fargo Electrical, Inc. and Raymond Restrepo. (TKL)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Noelle Dwarzski filed by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust re #8 MOTION for Default against Fargo Electrical Inc. and R. Restrepo, (Dwarzski, Noelle)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Default against Fargo Electrical Inc. and R. Restrepo,, filed by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/13/2021, (Dwarzski, Noelle)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust (Dwarzski, Noelle)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Raymond Restrepo on 9/10/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Fargo Electrical, Inc. on 9/7/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: The deadline for filing a Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan in the form set forth in the Order entered 9/2/2021, docket no. #2 , is sua sponte EXTENDED from 11/1/2021, to 12/6/2021. Absent timely filing of the Joint Status Report by 12/6/2021, or cause shown for failing to comply with the Order requiring Joint Status Report, docket no. #2 , this action shall be DISMISSED without prejudice. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SG)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/18/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/1/2021. (SRS)
September 2, 2021 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SG)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7232938) Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust(pty:pla), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Dwarzski, Noelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust et al v. Fargo Electrical Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Restrepo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo Electrical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Parson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Joseph Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?