Culver v. Nair et al
Plaintiff: Gary Culver
Defendant: Jayakrishnan Nair, John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10 and Jayakrishnan K Nair
Case Number: 2:2021cv01196
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Gary Culver Re Email Service on Defendant of Proposed Short Form Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brick, Patrick)
October 13, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Gary Culver re #13 Declaration, #14 Declaration, #16 Declaration, #15 Declaration, #12 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brick, Patrick)
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Dean Kalivas filed by Plaintiff Gary Culver re #12 MOTION to Remand (Brick, Patrick)
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Adam Greenhalgh filed by Plaintiff Gary Culver re #12 MOTION to Remand (Brick, Patrick)
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Patrick H. Brick filed by Plaintiff Gary Culver re #12 MOTION to Remand (Brick, Patrick)
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Gary Culver filed by Plaintiff Gary Culver re #12 MOTION to Remand (Brick, Patrick)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Gary Culver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/29/2021, (Brick, Patrick)
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for FBI Criminal Investigation of Mortgage Fraud, Burglary and Perjury, filed by Defendant Jayakrishnan K Nair. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Motion for Criminal Investigation, #2 Exhibit) Noted by clerk for 10/15/2021. (SR)
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 OBJECTIONS by Defendant Jayakrishnan K Nair to #9 Report and Recommendations. Noted by clerk for 10/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Objections, #2 Exhibit) (SR)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Notice of Removal, re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court recommends that this case be remanded to the King County Superior Court and that Defendant's IFP application (dkt. #2 ) be denied as moot. Objections to this Report and Recommendation, if any, should be filed with the Clerk and served upon all parties to this suit within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is signed. If no timely objections are filed, the matter will be ready for consideration by the District Judge on October 1, 2021. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PM) cc: Jayakrishnan K Nair via USPS
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER referring case to Judge Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. The Magistrate Judge shall screen Mr. Nair's notice of removal, Dkt. #1 , and enter into the record a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Defendant Nair via USPS
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Gary Culver re #6 Declaration, #5 Response to Motion Declaration of Service via Email (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brick, Patrick)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Gary Culver filed by Plaintiff Gary Culver re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Brick, Patrick)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Gary Culver, to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Brick, Patrick)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. Please contact the case administrators at (206) 370-8450 if you have any questions about your case. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (ST)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jayakrishnan Nair.(ST)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-08924-7 SEA, filed by Jayakrishnan Nair. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST) (Fee Pending)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culver v. Nair et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Culver
Represented By: Patrick Henry Brick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayakrishnan Nair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayakrishnan K Nair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?