Samal v. United States of America
Petitioner: Pradyumna Kumar Samal
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv01206
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE Documents served electronically to United States on 9/23/2021. Government's Answer due within 45 days of service and shall be noted for the fourth Friday after is it filed. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SEALING EXHIBIT: The Petitioner's Motion to Seal, Dkt. #3 , is GRANTED. Exhibit 3 to Mr. Samal's memorandum, Dkt. #4 , shall remain filed under seal. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Pradyumna Samal re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), #2 Memorandum by Movant Pradyumna Kumar Samal (Fox, Neil) Modified on 9/7/2021. Documents regenerated to AUSA. (ST)
September 7, 2021 Judge James L. Robart added. (ST)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Pradyumna Kumar Samal re #3 MOTION to Seal , #2 Memorandum (Fox, Neil)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal , filed by Movant Pradyumna Kumar Samal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/17/2021, (Fox, Neil)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Movant Pradyumna Kumar Samal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defense Objections to PSR, #2 Exhibit Government Response)(Fox, Neil)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255), related to criminal case: 18-214 ., filed by Pradyumna Kumar Samal.(Fox, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samal v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michael Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pradyumna Kumar Samal
Represented By: Neil Martin Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?