Suzuki et al v. Marinepolis USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Daisaku Suzuki and Kazuya Omoto
Defendant: Marinepolis U.S.A., Inc., Marinepolis Co., LDT, Mitsuyoshi Inohara, Ichiro Machida, Marinepolis USA Inc and Marinepolis Co Ltd
Case Number: 2:2021cv01229
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/23/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/9/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/16/2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Joseph Cadranell, II on behalf of Plaintiffs Kazuya Omoto, Daisaku Suzuki. (Cadranell, Robert)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mitsuyoshi Inohara, Ichiro Machida, Marinepolis Co LDT, Marinepolis USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(RE)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
September 10, 2021 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Mitsuyoshi Inohara, Ichiro Machida, Marinepolis Co., LDT, Marinepolis U.S.A., Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7243049) Attorney Dennis J. McGlothin added to party Kazuya Omoto(pty:pla), Attorney Dennis J. McGlothin added to party Daisaku Suzuki(pty:pla), filed by Daisaku Suzuki, Kazuya Omoto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(McGlothin, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suzuki et al v. Marinepolis USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisaku Suzuki
Represented By: Dennis J. McGlothin
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cadranell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kazuya Omoto
Represented By: Dennis J. McGlothin
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cadranell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinepolis U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinepolis Co., LDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsuyoshi Inohara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ichiro Machida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinepolis USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinepolis Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?