Morisky v. MMAS Research LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donald E Morisky
Defendant: MMAS Research LLC, Steven Trubow, polina feilbach, Rodney Watkins, Dustin Machi, MMAS Research Italy S.R.L., MMAS Research France, SAS, MMAS Research Italy SRL and MMAS Research France SAS
Case Number: 2:2021cv01301
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants Machi and Watkins Motion to Dismiss (ECF 20), filed by Plaintiff Donald E Morisky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of F. Christopher Austin)(Austin, F)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and referred to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel for all further proceedings as authorized by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. (GMR)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Donald E Morisky, to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Crowley, William)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Donald E Morisky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Crowley, William)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of Mark Lawrence Lorbiecki filed by Defendants MMAS Research LLC, Dustin Machi, Steven Trubow, Rodney Watkins re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Exhibit 1-3-1, #5 Exhibit 1-3-2, #6 Exhibit 1-3-3, #7 Exhibit 1-4, #8 Exhibit 2-1, #9 Exhibit 2-2, #10 Exhibit 2-3, #11 Exhibit 2-4, #12 Exhibit 2-5, #13 Exhibit 3-1, #14 Exhibit 3-1-1, #15 Exhibit 3-1-2, #16 Exhibit 3-1-3, #17 Exhibit 3-1-4, #18 Exhibit 3-1-5, #19 Exhibit 3-2, #20 Exhibit 3-3, #21 Exhibit 4, #22 Exhibit 5-1, #23 Exhibit 5-2, #24 Exhibit 5-3, #25 Exhibit 5-4, #26 Exhibit 5-5, #27 Exhibit 5-6, #28 Exhibit 5-7, #29 Exhibit 5-8, #30 Exhibit 5-9, #31 Exhibit 5-10, #32 Exhibit 5-11, #33 Exhibit 5-12, #34 Exhibit 6-1, #35 Exhibit 6-1-1, #36 Exhibit 6-1-2, #37 Exhibit 6-1-3, #38 Exhibit 6-1-4, #39 Exhibit 6-1-5, #40 Exhibit 6-1-6, #41 Exhibit 6-1-7, #42 Exhibit 6-1-8, #43 Exhibit 6-1-9, #44 Exhibit 6-1-10)(Lorbiecki, Mark)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants Dustin Machi, Rodney Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/26/2021, (Lorbiecki, Mark)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants MMAS Research LLC, Dustin Machi, Steven Trubow, Rodney Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/26/2021, (Lorbiecki, Mark)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Theresa H Rava, Tyler J Hermsen added for MMAS Research LLC, Dustin Machi, Steven Trubow, Rodney Watkins; per #18 Notice of Appearance. (AMD)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark Lawrence Lorbiecki on behalf of Defendants MMAS Research LLC, Dustin Machi, Steven Trubow, Rodney Watkins. (Lorbiecki, Mark)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Polina Feilbach on 10/2/2021, filed by Plaintiff Donald E Morisky. (Crowley, William)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dustin Machi on 10/8/2021, filed by Plaintiff Donald E Morisky. (Crowley, William)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Rodney Watkins on 10/7/2021, filed by Plaintiff Donald E Morisky. (Crowley, William)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Steven Trubow on 10/2/2021, filed by Plaintiff Donald E Morisky. (Crowley, William)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on MMAS Research LLC on 10/7/2021, filed by Plaintiff Donald E Morisky. (Crowley, William) Modified on 10/21/2021 (AMD).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney F Christopher Austin for plaintiff Donald E Morisky, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Donald E Morisky. (Crowley, William)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRAECIPE to attach document (corrected signature page) re #3 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Donald E Morisky (Crowley, William)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #3 Amended Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature, Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions.Corrected signature page must be filed by 10/13/2021. (RE)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY F. Christopher Austin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Donald E Morisky (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7269614 (Crowley, William)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney William J Crowley. Filed by Plaintiff Donald E Morisky. (Crowley, William)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Polina Feilbach, MMAS Research France SAS, MMAS Research Italy SRL, MMAS Research LLC, Dustin Machi, Steven Trubow, Rodney Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(RE)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (RE)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Pro Hac Vice Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Donald E Morisky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Crowley, William)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Donald E Morisky (Attachments: #1 Summons Steven Trubow, #2 Summons Polina Feilbach, #3 Summons Rodney Watkins, #4 Summons Dustin Machi, #5 Summons MMAS Research Italy SRL, #6 Summons MMAS Research France SAS)(Crowley, William)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge David W. Christel added. (RE)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7265031), filed by Donald E Morisky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Crowley, William) Modified on 9/27/2021 to edit document titles. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morisky v. MMAS Research LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E Morisky
Represented By: F Christopher Austin
Represented By: William J Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMAS Research LLC
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Lorbiecki
Represented By: Theresa H Rava
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Trubow
Represented By: Theresa H Rava
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Lorbiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: polina feilbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Watkins
Represented By: Theresa H Rava
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Lorbiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Machi
Represented By: Theresa H Rava
Represented By: Tyler J Hermsen
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Lorbiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMAS Research Italy S.R.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMAS Research France, SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMAS Research Italy SRL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMAS Research France SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?