Linehan et al v. Marie Institute of Behavioral Technology et al
Plaintiff: Marsha Linehan and BEHAVIORAL TECH RESEARCH INC
Defendant: MARIE INSTITUTE OF BEHAVIORAL TECHNOLOGY doing business as THE LINEHAN INSTITUTE, BEHAVIORAL TECH LLC and Marie Institute of Behavioral Technology a Washington nonprofit corporation doing business as The Linehan Institute
Case Number: 2:2021cv01330
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/10/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/27/2021, Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2022. (AQ)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AQ)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Behavioral Tech LLC and Marie Institute of Behavioral Technology answers due 11/30/2021. (AQ)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Behavioral Tech Research Inc, Marsha Linehan. Noting Date 11/4/2021, (Yeung, Binah)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/10/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas Anderson Grady on behalf of Defendants Behavioral Tech LLC, Marie Institute of Behavioral Technology. (Grady, Douglas)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT ACCEPTANCE of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendants Marie Institute of Behavioral Technology and Behavioral Tech LLC on 10/12/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Behavioral Tech Research Inc, Marsha Linehan with defendant's permission. (Yeung, Binah). Modified on 10/20/2021 - Document name updated (AQ).
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Copyright/Patent/Trademark Forms Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST) Modified on 9/30/2021. Entry regenerated to Michael Atkins at email address on complaint as CM/ECF has a different email address in the system. (ST)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Behavioral Tech LLC, Marie Institute of Behavioral Technology. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ST) Modified on 9/30/2021. Entry regenerated to Michael Atkins at email address on complaint as CM/ECF has a different email address in the system. (ST)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BEHAVIORAL TECH RESEARCH INC, Marsha Linehan (Yeung, Binah)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs BEHAVIORAL TECH RESEARCH INC, Marsha Linehan (Yeung, Binah)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs BEHAVIORAL TECH RESEARCH INC, Marsha Linehan (Yeung, Binah)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Behavioral Tech Research Inc, Marsha Linehan. (Yeung, Binah)
September 30, 2021 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (ST) Modified on 9/30/2021. Entry regenerated to Michael Atkins at email address on complaint as CM/ECF has a different email address in the system. (ST)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE LANHAM ACT, WASHINGTON'S PERSONALITY RIGHTS STATUTE, THE WASHINGTON CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT, UNLAWFUL USE OF NAME AND LIKENESS, AND BREACH OF CONTRACT against defendant(s) BEHAVIORAL TECH LLC, MARIE INSTITUTE OF BEHAVIORAL TECHNOLOGY (Receipt # BWAWDC-7271522) Attorney Binah B. Yeung added to party BEHAVIORAL TECH RESEARCH INC(pty:pla), Attorney Binah B. Yeung added to party Marsha Linehan(pty:pla), filed by Marsha Linehan, BEHAVIORAL TECH RESEARCH INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Restructure Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - February 13, 2018 Email)(Yeung, Binah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linehan et al v. Marie Institute of Behavioral Technology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Linehan
Represented By: Michael G Atkins
Represented By: Patrick Troy Hatfield
Represented By: Binah B. Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEHAVIORAL TECH RESEARCH INC
Represented By: Michael G Atkins
Represented By: Patrick Troy Hatfield
Represented By: Binah B. Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIE INSTITUTE OF BEHAVIORAL TECHNOLOGY doing business as THE LINEHAN INSTITUTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEHAVIORAL TECH LLC
Represented By: Douglas Anderson Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Institute of Behavioral Technology a Washington nonprofit corporation doing business as The Linehan Institute
Represented By: Douglas Anderson Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?