Guild Mortgage Company LLC v. CrossCountry Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Guild Mortgage Company LLC
Defendant: CrossCountry Mortgage LLC
Petitioner: Cory Flynn, Lisa Jolliffe and Christopher Jordan Flowers
Case Number: 2:2021cv01376
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 149 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. (Stone, Benjamin)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 148 JUDGMENT BY COURT: The Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (SS)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER adopting #142 Report and Recommendations. The Court OVERRULES Plaintiff's objections (Dkt. No. #143 ) and Defendant's objections (Dkt. No. #144 ). The Court GRANTS Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #108 ) and DENIES Plaintiff's motion for sanctions (Dkt. No. #117 ). The Court GRANTS in part Defendant's motion to seal (Dkt. No. #107 ), and exhibits H, I, and J (Dkt. Nos. #107 -2, #107 -3, #107 -4) shall be maintained under seal. Defendant is ORDERED to file a corporate disclosure statement in full compliance with LCR 7.1(b) or pay $25,000 in sanctions within 30 days of the date of this order. The case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RESPONSE to #143 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC to #142 Report and Recommendations,,. filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Stone, Benjamin)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 145 RESPONSE to #144 OBJECTIONS to filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC Plaintiff's Response to CrossCountry Mortgage, LLC's Objection to The Report and Recommendation of December 6, 2022 (Schwartz, Eric)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 OBJECTIONS re #142 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Stone, Benjamin) Modified to correct event type on 12/20/2022 (SR).
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC to #142 Report and Recommendations,,. Noting Date 12/20/2022, (Schwartz, Eric)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Motion terminated: #142 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION terminated per the filing of the Parties' #143 , #144 OBJECTIONS. Both the #143 and #144 OBJECTIONS are renoted for 1/6/2023, per the R&R. (SR)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court GRANTS Guild's request for judicial notice (dkt. #120 ) and CrossCountry's request for judicial notice (dkt. #131 ).The Court GRANTS in part CrossCountry's Motion to Seal (dkt. #107 ). The Court recommends CrossCountry's Motion to Dismiss (dkt. #108 ) be GRANTED. The Court DENIES Guild's Motion for Sanctions (dkt. #117 ).Objections to R&R, if any, should be filed with the Clerk and served upon all parties to this suit within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this R&R is signed. This matter is noted for 12/23/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment)(SR) (cc: Finance via ad hoc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 APPLICATION For Fees Against Defendant, CrossCountry Mortgage, LLC by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (Schwartz, Eric)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC re 135 Motion Hearing Set Deadlines To Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage's #138 Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause (Schwartz, Eric) Modified linkage on 11/17/2022 (SR).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 DECLARATION of Daniel Jemal re #138 Response (non motion) by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Stone, Benjamin)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 RESPONSE by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC re 135 Motion Hearing,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,, (Stone, Benjamin)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2022 before Judge Michelle L. Peterson.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Sheri Schelbert, sheri_schelbert@wawd.uscourts.gov Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2023, (Schelbert, Sheri) (Main Document 137 replaced on 11/4/2022 per direction of Court Reporter) (RE)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC for proceedings held on 10/31/2022 re 135 Motion Hearing,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,. Requesting Attorney: Benjamin J Stone.Posting of this Transcript Order form does not constitute an official request for transcript(s). If you have not already done so, you MUST contact the individual court reporter(s), Sheri Schelbert (sheri_schelbert@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507) to make payment arrangements and secure your desired delivery time. (Stone, Benjamin)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson- Dep Clerk: tfarrell; Pla Counsel: Eric Schwartz, Eric Lansverk, Renee Pirisi; Def Counsel: Michael Platt, John Conley; CR: Sheri Schelbert; Time of Hearing: 1:00pm; Courtroom: via Zoom video; Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2022 re Deft's #107 Second MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, #108 Second MOTION to Dismiss Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Pltf's #117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. Parties appear via Zoom video. Court reviews record. Court conducts colloquy, hears argument. Court defers ruling on the three #107 #108 #117 motions. By Nov. 14, 2022, Deft. is ordered to show cause pursuant to FRCP 11(c)(3) why the Court should not impose sanctions, including attorney's fees, for failure to comply with FRCP 11(b)(3). Deft should address enforceability of LCR 7.1(b) when an LLC party has upstream members who refuse to disclose their citizenship. Re: the Motion to Seal, Deft is also ordered to clarify what injury will result if the documents are not sealed. By Nov. 16, 2022, Pltf may provide an optional reply brief on the LCR 7.1(b) issue. Pltf may also file an optional fee application, addressing why fees requested were incurred due solely to Deft's negligence, and what resulting work would not be able to be used in a refiled case. (TF)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING TIME. Oral Argument is reset from 1:30 PM to 1:00 PM on 10/31/2022 before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. The clerk will send Zoom invites. (TF)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING. Oral Argument Hearing is reset for 10/31/2022 at 01:30 PM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, re: Defendant's Second Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (dkt. #107 ); (2) Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (dkt. #108 ); (3) Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions (dkt. #117 ); and (4) Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice (dkt. #120 ). The clerk will send a Zoom invite.(TF)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC, TO RESPONSE to #117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Lansverk, Eric)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 REQUEST by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC for Judicial Notice in Connection with Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Sanctions re #128 Declaration, #117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stone, Benjamin)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 DECLARATION of Benjamin Stone filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC re #117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Stone, Benjamin)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DECLARATION of Ashley C. Wakefield filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC re #117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Stone, Benjamin)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 DECLARATION of Michael A. Platt filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC re #117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Platt Declaration Exhibit A)(Stone, Benjamin)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE, by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC, to #117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. (Stone, Benjamin)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Noting Date Reset re #117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC: Noting Date 10/27/2022. (TF)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate CrossCountry Holding Corp., Other Affiliate Radcliff CCM I LLC, Other Affiliate CrossCountry Holdco, LLC for CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Stone, Benjamin)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 AMENDMENT TO CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTIFICATION AS TO AFFILIATES to #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Pesiri, Renee)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Noting Dates Reset re #120 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff Guild Mortgage LLCS Motion for Sanctions, re #117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC, re #108 Second MOTION to Dismiss Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and re #107 Second MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal: Noting Date 10/27/2022. (TF)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MINUTE ORDER: Oral argument is hereby set for 10/27/2022, at 1:30 p.m. via the Zoom platform, regarding: (1) Defendant's Second Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (dkt. #107 ); (2) Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (dkt. #108 ); (3) Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions (dkt. #117 ); and (4) Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice (dkt. #120 ). The clerk will send a Zoom invite. Both parties are hereby ORDERED to file Corporate Disclosure Statements that comply with Local Civil Rule 7.1, in particular provision (b), no later than 9/23/2022. Authorized by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting Parties' #122 Stipulated MOTION To Amend Briefing Schedules Related to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant. The deadline for CrossCountry to file and serve its Opposition to Guild's Motion for Sanctions shall be 10/3/2022. The deadline for Guild to file and serve its Reply in Support of its Motion for Sanctions shall be 10/11/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Stipulated MOTION To Amend Briefing Schedules Related to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant, filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/13/2022, (Bigos, John)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 EXHIBIT to Motion Request for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Pesiri, Renee)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff Guild Mortgage LLCS Motion for Sanctions re #117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC , filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Guild v CrossCountry - Motion for Sanctions - Request for Judicial Notice) Noting Date 10/14/2022, (Pesiri, Renee)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Pesiri, Renee)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 DECLARATION of Eric B. Schwartz filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC re #117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Pesiri, Renee)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC, filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/14/2022, (Pesiri, Renee)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE of Conditional Non-Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction re #108 Second MOTION to Dismiss Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction ; filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (Pesiri, Renee)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE to Withdraw Opposition to Renewed Motion to Seal re #110 Response to Motion ; filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (Pesiri, Renee)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting Parties' #113 Stipulated MOTION TO CONTINUE NOTING DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES. Defendant's Second Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (dkt. #107 ), Defendant's reply is due 9/2/2022. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-note this motion for 9/2/2022. Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss (dkt. #108 ), Plaintiff's response is due 9/5/2022, and Defendant's reply is due 9/9/2022. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-note this motion for 9/9/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Stipulated MOTION TO CONTINUE NOTING DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES, filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Continuing Noting Dates and Deadlines re Motion to Seal and Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 9/2/2022, (Pesiri, Renee)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM/Request for Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC re #110 Response to Motion Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion For Leave To File Under Seal (Schwartz, Eric) Modified on 8/23/2022 to edit title (SR).
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DECLARATION of Eric B. Schwartz filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC re #107 Second MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eric B. Schwartz, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Eric B. Schwartz)(Schwartz, Eric)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC, to #107 Second MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal. (Schwartz, Eric)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Second DECLARATION of Michael A. Platt filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC re #108 Second MOTION to Dismiss Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Bigos, John)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Second MOTION to Dismiss Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J) Noting Date 9/2/2022, (Bigos, John)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Second MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G-Under Seal, #2 Exhibit H-Under Seal, #3 Exhibit I-Under Seal, #4 Exhibit J-Under Seal) Noting Date 8/26/2022, (Bigos, John) Modified on 8/9/2022 to seal Exhibits G-J per filer's request (SB).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson- Dep Clerk: A. Quach; Pla Counsel: Eric Schwartz, Eric Lansverk, Renee Pesiri; Def Counsel: John Conley, Michael Platt; CR: Zoom Digital Recording; Time of Hearing: 12:00pm; Courtroom: Zoom; Discovery Conference Hearing held on 8/5/2022 re #102 LETTER re: Expedited Discovery filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Parties present via Zoom video. Court reviews record and hears arguments. For reasons stated on the record, the Court hereby ORDERS that CrossCountry Mortgage LLC produce all responsive documents and information to Guild Mortgage Company LLC's expedited discovery requests by August 10, 2022, produce a corporate designee for a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition by August 19, 2022, and withdraw its Motion to Seal (dkt. #95 ) and Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (dkt. #96 ) without prejudice to refiling by close of business on August 5, 2022. The Court further ORDERS that the remaining deadlines in this matter are extended as follows: Motions due by 10/14/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/14/2022, Discovery completed by 11/18/2022, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/18/2022, Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2022. (AQ)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #96 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION ; by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. (Bigos, John)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #95 MOTION to Seal ; by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. (Bigos, John)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 LETTER from Michael A. Platt re: Guild's request for EJD filed by CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Bigos, John)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 LETTER from Eric B. Schwartz Re: Expedited Discovery filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Pesiri, Renee)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER Authorized by the Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, United States Magistrate Judge: The Court ORDERS a discovery conference for August 5, 2022, at 12:00 p.m. by Zoom video. The Clerk will provide a Zoom invite to the parties. (AQ)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER re Defendant's #96 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. The Court hereby STRIKES the status conference scheduled for 8/5/2022, to be rescheduled, if appropriate, after the jurisdictional issue is resolved. Authorized by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit H by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC re #95 MOTION to Seal , #97 Declaration, #96 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (Stone, Benjamin)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit G by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC re #95 MOTION to Seal , #97 Declaration, #96 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (Stone, Benjamin)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 DECLARATION of Michael A. Platt filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC re #96 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, #95 MOTION to Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stone, Benjamin)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. Noting Date 8/19/2022, (Stone, Benjamin)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION to Seal , filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. Noting Date 8/12/2022, (Stone, Benjamin)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference held on 7/11/2022 before Judge Michelle L. Peterson.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Marci Chatelain, marci_chatelain@wawd.uscourts.gov. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2022, (MC)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2022 before Judge Michelle L. Peterson.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Sheri Schelbert, sheri_schelbert@wawd.uscourts.gov, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2022, (Schelbert, Sheri)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC for proceedings held on 07/14/2022 re 90 Motion Hearing,,. Requesting Attorney: Benjamin J Stone.Posting of this Transcript Order form does not constitute an official request for transcript(s). If you have not already done so, you MUST contact the individual court reporter(s), Sheri Schelbert (sheri_schelbert@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507) to make payment arrangements and secure your desired delivery time. (Stone, Benjamin)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying Defendant's #87 Letter/Motion for Discovery. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson.(SR)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson- Dep Clerk: tfarrell; Pla Counsel: Eric Schwartz, Eric Lansverk, Renee Pirisi; Def Counsel: John Conley; CR: Sheri Schelbert; Time of Hearing: 3:00pm; Courtroom: via Zoom video; Discovery Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2022 re #87 LETTER/MOTION for Discovery filed by CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. Parties present via Zoom video. Court reviews record, hears argument. Court makes ruling and will follow with a specific order posted to the docket. (TF)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 LETTER from Eric B. Schwartz Re: CCM Discovery Requests into Guild's Recruitment Practices filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Pesiri, Renee)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC for proceedings held on 07/11/2022 re 86 Status Conference,,,,. Requesting Attorney: Eric David Lansverk.Posting of this Transcript Order form does not constitute an official request for transcript(s). If you have not already done so, you MUST contact the individual court reporter(s), Marci Chatelain (marci_chatelain@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509) to make payment arrangements and secure your desired delivery time. (Lansverk, Eric)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 LETTER/MOTION for Discovery from Benjamin Stone and John Conley filed by CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Stone, Benjamin) Modified on 7/14/2022 to convert into a motion (TF).
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson- Dep Clerk: tfarrell; Pla Counsel: Eric Schwartz, Eric Lansverk, Renee Pirisi; Def Counsel: John Conley, Michael Platt, Movants' Maureen Mitchell; CR: Marci Chatelain; Time of Hearing: 10:30am; Courtroom: via Zoom video; Status Hearing held on 7/11/2022. Parties appear via Zoom video. Court reviews record, conducts colloquy. For reasons stated on the record, a follow-up Status Hearing is set for 8/5/2022 at 03:00 PM, on Zoom, before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Parties shall notify the Court by 8/2/2022 if they wish to file letter briefs to be considered at the 8/5/2022 conference. Additionally, a Telephone Conference is set for 7/14/2022 at 03:00 PM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. The Clerk will send call-in info. Defendant is permitted to file a 1 1/2-page letter brief by noon on 7/12/2022 regarding discovery into Guild's recruitment practices. Plaintiff may file a 1 1/2-page response by noon on 7/14/2022.(TF)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on 6/8/2022 before Judge Michelle L. Peterson.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Debbie Zurn, debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2022, (DZ)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re #83 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael A Platt for Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael A. Platt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7590932 (Stone, Benjamin)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (dkt. #52 ) is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. Non-party movants' Motions to Quash (dkt. # #55 , #61 , #65 ) are DENIED. The Court sets a status conference for 7/11/2022, at 10:30 a.m., to be conducted on Zoom. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC for proceedings held on 06/08/2022 re 80 Motion Hearing,,,,. Requesting Attorney: Eric David Lansverk.Posting of this Transcript Order form does not constitute an official request for transcript(s). If you have not already done so, you MUST contact the individual court reporter(s), Debbie Zurn (debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504) to make payment arrangements and secure your desired delivery time. (Lansverk, Eric)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson- Dep Clerk: tfarrell; Pla Counsel: Eric Lanswerk; Def Counsel: John Conley, Maureen Mitchell; CR: Debbie Zurn; Time of Hearing: 10:30am; Courtroom: via Zoom video; Motion Hearing held on 6/8/2022 re #52 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC, #55 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by Non-Party Cory Flynn filed by Cory Flynn, #65 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena filed by Christopher Jordan Flowers, #61 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena filed by Lisa Jolliffe. Parties appear via Zoom video. Court reviews record, conducts colloquy and hears parties' argument on pending #52 #55 #61 #65 motions. The Court GRANTS in Part and DENIES in PART Pltf's #52 Motion to Compel. The Court DENIES the #55 #61 #65 Motions to Quash. The Court will follow up with a brief written order summarizing the Court's rulings. The Court also sets a Status Hearing for 7/11/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. The clerk will provide Zoom invites. (TF)
June 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 DECLARATION of Maureen L. Mitchell in Support of Reply in Support of filed by Movants Christopher Jordan Flowers, Lisa Jolliffe re #65 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena, #61 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Mitchell, Maureen)
June 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 REPLY, filed by Movant Lisa Jolliffe, TO RESPONSE to #61 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Mitchell, Maureen)
June 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REPLY, filed by Movant Christopher Jordan Flowers, TO RESPONSE to #65 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Mitchell, Maureen)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 DECLARATION of Renee Pesiri filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC re #61 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21)(Pesiri, Renee)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC, to #61 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena. (Pesiri, Renee)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DECLARATION of Renee Pesiri filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC re #65 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21)(Pesiri, Renee)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC, to #65 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena. (Pesiri, Renee)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DECLARATION of Maureen L. Mitchell filed by Movant Cory Flynn re #55 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by Non-Party Cory Flynn (Mitchell, Maureen)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY, filed by Movant Cory Flynn, TO RESPONSE to #55 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by Non-Party Cory Flynn (Mitchell, Maureen)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC, TO RESPONSE to #52 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions (Pesiri, Renee)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE to the parties: The Court previously set oral argument hearing in this matter on the motions at docket numbers #52 #55 . The Court adds both #61 #65 MOTIONS for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena, to the oral argument calendar set for 6/8/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. The clerk will send Zoom invite. (TF)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DECLARATION of Renee Pesiri filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC re #55 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by Non-Party Cory Flynn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19)(Pesiri, Renee)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC, to #55 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by Non-Party Cory Flynn. (Pesiri, Renee)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DECLARATION of Maureen L. Mitchell filed by Movant Christopher Jordan Flowers re #65 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Mitchell, Maureen)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena, filed by Movant Christopher Jordan Flowers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/3/2022, (Mitchell, Maureen)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Maureen L Mitchell on behalf of Movant Christopher Jordan Flowers. (Mitchell, Maureen)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DECLARATION of Lisa Jolliffe filed by Movant Lisa Jolliffe re #61 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Mitchell, Maureen)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Zoom Oral Argument Hearing re: #52 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions, and #55 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by Non-Party Cory Flynn: Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. The clerk will send Zoom invite. (TF)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena, filed by Movant Lisa Jolliffe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/3/2022, (Mitchell, Maureen)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Maureen L Mitchell on behalf of Movant Lisa Jolliffe. (Mitchell, Maureen)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECLARATION of Benjamin Stone filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC re #52 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions (Slocum, Kylene)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE, by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC, to #52 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions. (Slocum, Kylene)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Maureen L Mitchell on behalf of Movant Cory Flynn. (Mitchell, Maureen)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTE: Document #55 was filed incorrectly/improperly. Appearance of attorney Maureen L. Mitchell is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (SR) (cc: Attorney Mitchell via ad hoc)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECLARATION of Maureen L. Mitchell filed by Unknown Cory Flynn re #55 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by Non-Party Cory Flynn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Cory Flynn)(Mitchell, Maureen)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by Non-Party Cory Flynn, filed by Objector Cory Flynn, Unknown Cory Flynn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/27/2022, (Mitchell, Maureen)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #52 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions, #53 Declaration,,,,, (Pesiri, Renee)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DECLARATION of Renee Pesiri filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC re #52 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit Exhibit 41)(Pesiri, Renee)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions, filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Noting Date 5/27/2022, (Pesiri, Renee)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying Defendant's #40 Motion for Leave to File Permissive Counterclaim. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re #49 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Renee Pesiri for Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY RENEE PESIRI FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7494425 (Lansverk, Eric)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re Parties' #44 Proposed Stipulated MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re Parties' #45 Proposed Stipulated MOTION Agreement re Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER re Parties' #44 Proposed Stipulated MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. The Court will consider the stipulated motion after provision of the redlined version. Authorized by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Proposed Stipulated MOTION Agreement re Discovery of Electronically Stored Information, filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Noting Date 3/24/2022, (Lansverk, Eric)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Proposed Stipulated MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Noting Date 3/24/2022, (Lansverk, Eric)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPLY, filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC, TO RESPONSE to #40 MOTION for Leave to File Permissive Counterclaim (Slocum, Kylene)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC, to #40 MOTION for Leave to File Permissive Counterclaim. (Schwartz, Eric)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DECLARATION of Benjamin Stone filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC re #40 MOTION for Leave to File Permissive Counterclaim (Slocum, Kylene)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Permissive Counterclaim, filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. Noting Date 3/18/2022, (Slocum, Kylene)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING #35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC's motion to stay (Dkt. No. #23 ) is DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #36 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John R Conley for Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Jury Trial is set for 2/13/2023 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. Joinder of Parties due by 2/23/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 3/23/2022, Motions due by 8/15/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/16/2022, Discovery completed by 9/19/2022, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 9/19/2022, Dispositive motions due by 10/17/2022, Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2023, Motions in Limine due by 2/3/2023, Trial briefs/Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/6/2023. (TF)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John Conley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7413878 (Stone, Benjamin)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to deny Defendant's #23 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Arbitration. The Court GRANTS Guild's request for judicial notice (dkt. #27 ). Objections to this Report and Recommendation, if any, should be filed with the Clerk and served upon all parties to this suit within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is signed. Noting Date 2/4/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LH)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (Slocum, Kylene)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 10-15. (Lansverk, Eric)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DECLARATION of Benjamin Stone ISO Reply to Motion For Stay filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC re #23 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Arbitration (Slocum, Kylene)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY, filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC, TO RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Arbitration (Slocum, Kylene)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Benjamin J Stone for Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC from December 27th - 31st, 2021. (Stone, Benjamin)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECLARATION of Charles Nay In Support of Guild Mortgage's Opposition to Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC re #23 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Arbitration (Schwartz, Eric)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Gina Durosko In Support of Guild Mortgage's Opposition to Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC re #23 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Arbitration (Schwartz, Eric)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Opposition to Motion to Stay re #25 Response to Motion , filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Noting Date 12/17/2021, (Schwartz, Eric)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of Eric B. Schwartz In Support of Opposition to Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC re #23 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Schwartz, Eric)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC, to #23 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Arbitration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Eric)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #23 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Arbitration. Filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. Noting Date 12/17/2021, (Stone, Benjamin)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Arbitration, filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. Noting Date 12/17/2021 12/3/2021, (Slocum, Kylene) Modified on 11/30/2021 to renote noting date per dkt. #24 (SR).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses by CrossCountry Mortgage LLC.(Slocum, Kylene)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kylene Slocum on behalf of Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. (Slocum, Kylene)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Joint Status Report due by 12/27/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/3/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/17/2021. (TF)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour and referred to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (TF)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Taurean K Brown for Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (Lansverk, Eric)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, re: #16 Stipulated MOTION; CrossCountry Mortgage LLC answer due 11/26/2021. (TF)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, filed by Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. Noting Date 11/8/2021, (Slocum, Kylene)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/12/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Bradley Bigos on behalf of Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. (Bigos, John)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J Stone on behalf of Defendant CrossCountry Mortgage LLC. (Stone, Benjamin)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Taurean K Brown for Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric Schwartz for Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Chad S Hummel for Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Chad S. Hummel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7289411 (Lansverk, Eric)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric B. Schwartz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7289407 (Lansverk, Eric)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Taurean K. Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7289397 (Lansverk, Eric)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Lansverk, Eric)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Jury Demand Improperly Indicated.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) CrossCountry Mortgage LLC (ST)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #1 Complaint. Counsel filed #1 Complaint and exhibit(s) as one document. Documents separated and exhibit(s) posted as Attachment# 2.) (ST)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (ST)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Guild Holdings Company for Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Lansverk, Eric)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (Lansverk, Eric)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) CrossCountry Mortgage LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7285159) Attorney Eric David Lansverk added to party Guild Mortgage Company LLC(pty:pla), filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Lansverk, Eric) (Modified on 10/12/2021. Counsel filed complaint and exhibits as one document. Documents separated and exhibits posted as #2 Exhibit) (ST) Modified on 10/14/20201 to strike jury demand language (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guild Mortgage Company LLC v. CrossCountry Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guild Mortgage Company LLC
Represented By: Eric David Lansverk
Represented By: Chad S Hummel
Represented By: Eric Schwartz
Represented By: Taurean K Brown
Represented By: Renee Pesiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CrossCountry Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J Stone
Represented By: John Bradley Bigos
Represented By: Kylene Slocum
Represented By: John R Conley
Represented By: Michael A Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cory Flynn
Represented By: Maureen L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lisa Jolliffe
Represented By: Maureen L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Jordan Flowers
Represented By: Maureen L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?