Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot S.A. and Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01449
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/11/2022, (Miller, Gregory)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Parties' #20 Stipulated MOTION for Extension to Respond to Complaint. Boeing's time to respond to LOT's Complaint shall be extended from11/18/2021, to 12/10/2021. The parties have also agreed to the following briefing schedule for a motion to dismiss: 12/10/2021: Boeing's Motion to Dismiss Due. 1/28/2022: LOT's Opposition Due. 2/11/2022: Boeing's Reply Due. Boeing shall note their Motion to Dismiss for consideration on 2/11/2022. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
November 19, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The Boeing Company on 11/1/2021, filed by Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA. (Park, Mirin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The Boeing Company on 11/1/2021, filed by Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA. (Park, Mirin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The Boeing Company on 11/2/2021, filed by Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA. (Park, Mirin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The Boeing Company on 10/28/2021, filed by Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA. (Park, Mirin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The Boeing Company on 11/2/2021, filed by Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA. (Park, Mirin)
November 12, 2021 REFERRING Joint Status Report deadline and #20 Stipulated MOTION for Extension to Respond to Complaint and [Proposed] Order to: Judge Ricardo S. Martinez per #21 Order Reassigning Case. (GMR)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez for all further proceedings as related to 2:21-cv-00488-RSM and 2:21-cv-00918-RSM. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour and Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke are no longer assigned to this case. Authorized by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
November 9, 2021 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION for Extension to Respond to Complaint and [Proposed] Order, filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. Noting Date 11/9/2021, (Connelly, Ulrike)
November 8, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00918-RSM; 2:21-cv-00488-RSM, by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Connelly, Ulrike)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anthony U Battista for Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 4, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour and referred to Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke for all further proceedings. Authorized by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. (GMR)
November 4, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Boeing Company (Connelly, Ulrike)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Diana Gurfel Shapiro for Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Evan Kwarta for Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mary Dow for Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/9/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (GMR)
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mary Dow FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7317725 (Park, Mirin)
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Evan Kwarta FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7317706 (Park, Mirin)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Diana Gurfel Shapiro FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7317672 (Park, Mirin)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony U. Battista FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7317641 (Park, Mirin)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ulrike Buschbacher Connelly on behalf of Defendant The Boeing Company. (Connelly, Ulrike)
November 2, 2021 Attorneys Steve Y Koh, Eric B Wolff, Gregory F Miller, and Michelle L. Maley added for The Boeing Company per #7 Notice of Appearance. (GMR)
November 2, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, The Boeing Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/9/2021. (GMR)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/18/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/24/2022, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
November 1, 2021 Joint Status Report deadline NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 1/31/2022. (GMR)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(RE)
October 27, 2021 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (RE)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Mirin Ellen Park. Filed by Plaintiff Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA. (Park, Mirin)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot S.A. (Park, Mirin)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) The Boeing Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7306594) Attorney Mirin Ellen Park added to party Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot S.A.(pty:pla), filed by Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Chicago, #3 Summons - Sacramento, #4 Summons - Springfield, #5 Summons - Tumwater, #6 Summons - Wilmington)(Park, Mirin) Modified on 10/27/2021 to edit document titles. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot S.A.
Represented By: Mirin Ellen Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polskie Linie Lotnicze Lot SA
Represented By: Anthony U Battista
Represented By: Diana Gurfel Shapiro
Represented By: Evan Kwarta
Represented By: Mary Dow
Represented By: Mirin Ellen Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Eric B Wolff
Represented By: Gregory F Miller
Represented By: Michelle L. Maley
Represented By: Steve Y Koh
Represented By: Ulrike Buschbacher Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?