Cruz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carl L. Cruz and Carl L Cruz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv01454
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David G Estudillo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Hon. David G. Estudillo. Opening Brief due by 12/16/2021, Responsive Brief due by 1/13/2022, Reply Brief due by 1/27/2022 (ZMG) Modified on 11/22/2021 to strike docket entry as it was entered prematurely. (MGC).
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J. Groebner on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Groebner, Benjamin)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on USAO-WDWA on 11/5/2021, filed by Plaintiff Carl L Cruz. (Oliver, David)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(AMD)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Carl L Cruz.(AMD)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by Hon. David G. Estudillo.(AMD)
October 27, 2021 Hon. David G. Estudillo added. (ST)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Carl L. Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Oliver, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl L. Cruz
Represented By: David P Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl L Cruz
Represented By: David P Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Benjamin J. Groebner
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?