Emerson v. Johnson RV et al
Plaintiff: Jackie Emerson
Defendant: Johnson RV, Equalizer Days Co, Triple E Recreational Ltd, Mercedes-Benz USA and Mercedes-Benz Vans USA
Case Number: 2:2021cv01469
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Erica M Deatherage for Defendant Triple E Recreational Ltd from December 16, 2021 - March 16, 2022. (Deatherage, Erica)
December 20, 2021 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #17 Notice of Unavailability was improperly signed by Brian Del Gatto. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (SR)
December 17, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Erica M Deatherage for Defendant Triple E Recreational Ltd from December 16, 2021 to March 16, 2022. (Deatherage, Erica)
December 3, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Sarah E. Davenport on behalf of Defendant Equalizer Days Co. (Davenport, Sarah)
November 17, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint; by Johnson RV.(Wallace, Gregory)
November 12, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint; by Triple E Recreational Ltd.(Deatherage, Erica)
November 11, 2021 Filing 13 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Triple E Recreational Ltd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Deatherage, Erica)
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Days Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent NNJMK, LLC, Corporate Parent JLoose, LLC for Equalizer Days Co. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Equalizer Days Co (Butler, Kyle)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal,, by Equalizer Days Co.(Butler, Kyle)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Johnson RV (Wallace, Gregory)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/4/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/11/2022, Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2022. (GT)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - NOT submitted properly or NOT on file (Please refer to #LCR 101(b)(3) to file a proper jury demand) (ST)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s), Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (Ad Hoc, Brian Del Gatto; Bob L O'Halloran, Jr.) (ST)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 EXHIBIT to Declaration of Filing Notice of Removal With State Court by Defendant Triple E Recreational Ltd (Deatherage, Erica)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Filing Notice of Removal With State Court Clerk by Defendant Triple E Recreational Ltd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Deatherage, Erica)
October 29, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Johnson RV; Equalizer Days Co; Mercedes-Benz USA; Mercedes Benz Vans USA must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/5/2021. (ST)
October 29, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (ST)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiffs of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal,, ; filed by Defendant Triple E Recreational Ltd. (Deatherage, Erica)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Triple E Recreational Ltd (Deatherage, Erica) Modified on 10/29/2021. Corporate parent(s) Philipp R Ens Ltd and Terry Elias Ltd added to docket. (ST)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-10755-5; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7311867) Attorney Erica M Deatherage added to party Triple E Recreational Ltd(pty:dft), filed by Triple E Recreational Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Erica M. Deatherage Exhibit, #3 Complaint Exhibit, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Deatherage, Erica) Modified on 10/29/2021. Corrected descriptions of Attachments 2-13. (ST) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2021: #14 NOA for Johnson RV, Gregory G. Wallace) (SR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2021: #15 NOA for Johnson RV Bob L O'Halloran, Jr.) (SR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerson v. Johnson RV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Emerson
Represented By: Eric Charles Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson RV
Represented By: Gregory G Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equalizer Days Co
Represented By: Kyle M. Butler
Represented By: Sarah E. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple E Recreational Ltd
Represented By: Erica M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz Vans USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?