Chen v. King County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Huy-Ying Chen
Defendant: King County Sheriff's Office and Hugo R Esparza
Case Number: 2:2021cv01492
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
December 20, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Lauren King. Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez no longer assigned to the case. (LW)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hugo R Esparza, King County Sheriff's Office.(Cook, Julie)
December 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Huy-Ying Chen. (Chen, Huy-Ying)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Julie Dee Cook on behalf of Defendants Hugo R Esparza, King County Sheriff's Office. (Cook, Julie)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Hugo R Esparza on 11/15/2021, filed by Plaintiff Huy-Ying Chen. (Chen, Huy-Ying)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on King County Sheriff Office on 11/15/2021, filed by Plaintiff Huy-Ying Chen. (Chen, Huy-Ying)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE: Plaintiff Huy-Ying Chen has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. Enclosed you will find summons' issued to the King County Sheriff's Office and Hugo R. Esparza. (cc: plaintiff w/summons' via USPS) (ST)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Huy-Ying Chen against defendant(s) Hugo R Esparza, King County Sheriff's Office with JURY DEMAND. (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # SEA105776) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Email from Filer)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. King County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huy-Ying Chen
Represented By: Huy-Ying Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Howard P Schneiderman
Represented By: Julie Dee Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo R Esparza
Represented By: Howard P Schneiderman
Represented By: Julie Dee Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?