United States of America v. Lafferty et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Erin M Lafferty, King County, Wells Fargo Bank, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Seattle Savings Bank and Fannie Mae
Case Number: 2:2021cv01522
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff United States of America, to #14 MOTION. (Koven, Cassondra)
January 4, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Fred B Burnside on behalf of Defendant Fannie Mae. (Burnside, Fred)
January 4, 2022 Attorney Frederick A Haist added for Fannie Mae; per #16 Notice of Appearance. (SR)
December 28, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon King County on 11/19/2021 (Atchison, Jennifer) Modified on 12/28/2021 to add party waiving service and date (SR).
December 23, 2021 Defendant has filed a #14 motion requesting the Court find the complaint filed is void without noting the motion as required by the Court's local rules. The Court construes the motion as seeking dismissal and therefore notes the motion for 1/14/22. (AQ)
December 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Reinstate and Adjudicate Complaint, filed by Defendant Erin M Lafferty. (SR) (Main Document 14 replaced on 1/3/2022. Additional pages added that were originally missed when scanned in, NEF regenerated) (SR).
December 23, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER/Response to #1 Complaint, by Erin M Lafferty (filing as pro se). (SR) (Defendant's address updated on the docket)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Fannie Mae. (SR)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer H Atchison on behalf of Defendant King County. (Atchison, Jennifer)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff United States of America (Koven, Cassondra)
December 16, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) JP Morgan Chase Bank, King County, Erin M Lafferty, Wells Fargo Bank, Fannie Mae, filed by United States of America.(Koven, Cassondra)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that the United States shall file the Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit 1 to its Motion within fourteen (14) days of this order. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SR)
December 15, 2021 Attorney Fred B Burnside for JP Morgan Chase Bank added; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (CDA)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (KMP)
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) Noting Date 12/14/2021, (Koven, Cassondra)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America. (Koven, Cassondra)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Frederick A Haist on behalf of Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Haist, Frederick)
November 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, King County, Erin M Lafferty, Seattle Savings Bank, Wells Fargo Bank. (Attachments: #1 JP Chase Bank, #2 Wells Fargo Bank, #3 Seattle Savings Bank, #4 King County)(AQ)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Koven, Cassondra)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) JP Morgan Chase Bank, King County, Erin M Lafferty, Seattle Savings Bank, Wells Fargo Bank Attorney Cassondra Koven added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koven, Cassondra) (No Fee Required)
November 10, 2021 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lafferty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Cassondra Koven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin M Lafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Jennifer H Atchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Represented By: Frederick A Haist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Represented By: Frederick A Haist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?