Lewis v. Department of Social and Health Services et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Eugene Lewis
Defendant: Department of Social and Health Services, Melinda Young and Melissa J Osman
Case Number: 2:2021cv01568
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Referring Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 14 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (ST)
January 7, 2022 Filing 13 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (ST)
January 6, 2022 Filing 12 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (ST)
December 28, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED Emergency Motion for Preliminary Hearing and Appointment of Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (NOTE: Document originally received by the court on 12/11/2021, but returned to plaintiff as it did not include a case number. Corrected document received on 12/28/2021.) (ST)
December 28, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED Emergency Motion to Stop Ongoing Harm of Assault, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (NOTE: Document originally received by the court on 12/11/2021, but returned to plaintiff as it did not include a case number. Corrected document received on 12/28/2021.) (ST)
December 24, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED Emergency Discharge and Dismissal of Charges, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (ST)
December 18, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED Motion for Additional Claims, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (ST)
December 18, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED Motion for Emergency Discharge, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (ST)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS to #5 Report and Recommendations, by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. Noting Date 1/7/2022. (ST)
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2022; Noting Date 1/7/2022. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order)(ST)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (Docket updated. Resent #3 Letter to plaintiff at current address via USPS) (ST)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (ST)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Vaughan, filed by Anthony Eugene Lewis. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 PROPOSED Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Prison Trust Account Statement)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Department of Social and Health Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Eugene Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Social and Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa J Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?