Watson et al v. Roff et al
Plaintiff: Eric Watson doing business as Jookrs Hulk Hauling & Salvage Services, Sarah Watson doing business as Jookrs Hulk Hauling & Salvage Services and Sarah M Watson doing business as Jookrs Hulk Hauling & Salvage Services
Defendant: Mike Roff Latitude Marine Services CEO doing business as Latitude Marine Services, KJ Roff Latitude Marine Services President doing business as Latitude Marine Services, Chrisi Dite Latitude Marine Services Service Writer doing business as Latitude Marine Services, Bob Cornelius Latitude Marine Services Service Writer doing business as Latitude Marine Services, Latitude Marine Services LLC, Jay McKittrick doing business as Latitude Marine Services, Dikes Marine Services, Debbie Helms doing business as Dikes Marine Services, Bruce Helms doing business as Dikes Marine Services, Norgard Boat Transport, Edward Humflee doing business as Norgard Boat Transport, Dena Humflee doing business as Norgard Boat Transport, Moger Yacht Transport and Warren Moger, Sr
Case Number: 2:2021cv01622
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Party Moger Yacht Transport and Warren Moger, Sr added per the filing of Plaintiffs' #15 Amended Complaint. (SR)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STRICKEN as it was entered in error by clerk's office staff Notice of Filing Deficiency re Eric Watson, Sarah M Watson re #15 Amended Complaint. ***Action Required*** Summons in Wrong Format.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SB) Modified on 1/28/2022 (SB).
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND filed by Sarah M Watson, Eric Watson. (Attachments: #1 Summonses) (SB)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP Granted) filed by Eric Watson, Sarah M Watson. (SB)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 #12 Motions for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (SB) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Eric Watson. (SB)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE: Plaintiff Sarah M Watson has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (CDA)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff Eric Watson failed to sign his motion to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP), Dkt. #7 . Plaintiff must, within twenty (20) days of the date of this order, submit an IFP application with signatures on both the IFP and Written Consent for Payment of Costs portions of the form. Authorized by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (SB) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (SB) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Expedited Hold, Stop, End Attempt of Sale, and or Destruction of Vessel. Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Complaint no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Eric Watson. (SB)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Sarah Watson. (SB)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Expedited Hold, Stop, End Attempt of Sale, and or Destruction of Plaintiffs' Vessel filed by Plaintiffs Eric Watson, Sarah Watson. Noted by clerk for 12/24/2021. (SB)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Eric Watson, Sarah Watson. (SB)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid, Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 1/5/2022 to correct IFP application (CDA)cc both plaintiffs via US Mail with IFP for each plaintiff
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PROPOSED Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Eric Watson, Sarah Watson. (CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson et al v. Roff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Watson doing business as Jookrs Hulk Hauling & Salvage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Watson doing business as Jookrs Hulk Hauling & Salvage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah M Watson doing business as Jookrs Hulk Hauling & Salvage Services
Represented By: Sarah M Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Roff Latitude Marine Services CEO doing business as Latitude Marine Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KJ Roff Latitude Marine Services President doing business as Latitude Marine Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrisi Dite Latitude Marine Services Service Writer doing business as Latitude Marine Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Cornelius Latitude Marine Services Service Writer doing business as Latitude Marine Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latitude Marine Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay McKittrick doing business as Latitude Marine Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dikes Marine Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Helms doing business as Dikes Marine Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Helms doing business as Dikes Marine Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norgard Boat Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Humflee doing business as Norgard Boat Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dena Humflee doing business as Norgard Boat Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moger Yacht Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Moger, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?