National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA et al v M/T Levant et al
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance Company of Canada, State National Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, ACE American Insurance Company, Sovereign General Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy No.'s ENSAM1900387, ENSAM1900384, ENSAM1900399, Petrogas Energy Corp., Arch Insurance (UK) Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy No.'s ENSAM1900387, ENSAM1900206, ENSAM1900393, ENSAM1900398 and Petrogas Energy Corp
Defendant: M/T Levant, Avance Levant Ltd, Exmar Ship Management NV, M/T Lindsey Foss, M/T Garth Foss and Foss Maritime Co
Case Number: 2:2021cv01670
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher W Nicoll on behalf of Defendants Avance Levant Ltd, Exmar Ship Management NV, M/T Levant. (Nicoll, Christopher)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re Parties' #11 Stipulated MOTION Setting Deadline to Answer. Defendants have until 4/12/2022 to Answer Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (ECF Doc. No. #3 ). Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
February 9, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brandon T. Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs ACE American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance (UK) Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy No.'s ENSAM1900387, ENSAM1900206, ENSAM1900393, ENSAM1900398, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, Petrogas Energy Corp, Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance Company of Canada, Sovereign General Insurance Company, State National Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7433449 (Siddiki, Adil)
February 9, 2022 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alyssa J. Endelman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs ACE American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance (UK) Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy No.'s ENSAM1900387, ENSAM1900206, ENSAM1900393, ENSAM1900398, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, Petrogas Energy Corp, Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance Company of Canada, Sovereign General Insurance Company, State National Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. BWAWDC-7433430 (Siddiki, Adil)
February 4, 2022 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order Setting Deadline to Answer, filed by Plaintiffs ACE American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance (UK) Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy No.'s ENSAM1900387, ENSAM1900206, ENSAM1900393, ENSAM1900398, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, Petrogas Energy Corp, Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance Company of Canada, Sovereign General Insurance Company, State National Insurance Company. Noting Date 2/4/2022, (Siddiki, Adil) Modified on 2/4/2022 (SB).
February 4, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Avance Levant Ltd mailed on 12/17/2021; Exmar Ship Management NV mailed on 12/17/2021; M/T Levant mailed on 12/17/2021 (Siddiki, Adil)
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Foss Maritime Co mailed on 1/24/2022 (Siddiki, Adil)
January 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Colin Jeffrey Folawn on behalf of Defendant Foss Maritime Co. (Folawn, Colin)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the request of plaintiffs' counsel and for good cause shown, the deadlines set for in the Court's 1/14/22 order at docket #7 are continued as follows: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/28/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/5/2022, Joint Status Report due by 5/12/2022. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LC)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/11/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/18/2022. (LC)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Avance Levant Ltd, Exmar Ship Management NV, Foss Maritime Co, M/T Garth Foss, M/T Levant, M/T Lindsey Foss. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4, #4 Summons 5, #5 Summons 6)(SB)
December 28, 2021 Filing 5 SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted - attempted upon defendant All Defendants. PRAECIPE to Issue Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Clerk - please issue summons, #2 Summons Clerk - please issue summons, #3 Summons Clerk - please issue summons, #4 Summons Clerk - please issue summons, #5 Summons Clerk - please issue summons, #6 Summons Clerk - please issue summons)(Denton, David) Modified on 12/29/2021 to correct docket text (SB).
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #3 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (Ad Hoc, Erin Lahey; David Denton) NOTE: Mr. Denton's email address in ECF is different than the one on the complaint/amended complaint. Notice regenerated. (ST)
December 15, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/22/2021. (Ad Hoc, Erin Lahey; David Denton) NOTE: Mr. Denton's email address in ECF is different than the one on the complaint/amended complaint. Notice regenerated. (ST)
December 15, 2021 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (Ad Hoc, Erin Lahey; David Denton) NOTE: Mr. Denton's email address in ECF is different than the one on the complaint/amended complaint. Judge assignment regenerated. (ST)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by State National Insurance Company, Petrogas Energy Corp., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance Company of Canada, ACE American Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy No.'s ENSAM1900387, ENSAM1900384, ENSAM1900399, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Sovereign General Insurance Company.(Siddiki, Adil)
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to attach document Verification re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Plaintiffs ACE American Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy No.'s ENSAM1900387, ENSAM1900384, ENSAM1900399, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, Petrogas Energy Corp., Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance Company of Canada, Sovereign General Insurance Company, State National Insurance Company (Siddiki, Adil)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # CWAWDC-7369969) Attorney Adil Aziz Siddiki added to party ACE American Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Adil Aziz Siddiki added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy No.'s ENSAM1900387, ENSAM1900384, ENSAM1900399(pty:pla), Attorney Adil Aziz Siddiki added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (pty:pla), Attorney Adil Aziz Siddiki added to party National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA(pty:pla), Attorney Adil Aziz Siddiki added to party Petrogas Energy Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Adil Aziz Siddiki added to party Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance Company of Canada(pty:pla), Attorney Adil Aziz Siddiki added to party Sovereign General Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Adil Aziz Siddiki added to party State National Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by State National Insurance Company, Petrogas Energy Corp., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance Company of Canada, ACE American Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy No.'s ENSAM1900387, ENSAM1900384, ENSAM1900399, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Sovereign General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siddiki, Adil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA et al v M/T Levant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: David Denton
Represented By: Erin M Lahey
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance Company of Canada
Represented By: David Denton
Represented By: Erin M Lahey
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State National Insurance Company
Represented By: David Denton
Represented By: Erin M Lahey
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: David Denton
Represented By: Erin M Lahey
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: David Denton
Represented By: Erin M Lahey
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sovereign General Insurance Company
Represented By: David Denton
Represented By: Erin M Lahey
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy No.'s ENSAM1900387, ENSAM1900384, ENSAM1900399
Represented By: David Denton
Represented By: Erin M Lahey
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrogas Energy Corp.
Represented By: David Denton
Represented By: Erin M Lahey
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arch Insurance (UK) Limited
Represented By: David Denton
Represented By: Erin M Lahey
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy No.'s ENSAM1900387, ENSAM1900206, ENSAM1900393, ENSAM1900398
Represented By: David Denton
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrogas Energy Corp
Represented By: David Denton
Represented By: Adil Aziz Siddiki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/T Levant
Represented By: Chris P Reilly
Represented By: Christopher W Nicoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avance Levant Ltd
Represented By: Chris P Reilly
Represented By: Christopher W Nicoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exmar Ship Management NV
Represented By: Chris P Reilly
Represented By: Christopher W Nicoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/T Lindsey Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/T Garth Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foss Maritime Co
Represented By: Colin Jeffrey Folawn
Represented By: Molly J. Henry
Represented By: Philip Raoul Lempriere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?