Docklight Brands Inc v. Tilray Inc et al
Plaintiff: Docklight Brands Inc. and Docklight Brands Inc
Defendant: Tilray Inc., High Park Holdings, Ltd., Tilray Inc and High Park Holdings Ltd
Case Number: 2:2021cv01692
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Patrick Moen filed by Plaintiff Docklight Brands Inc re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and to Strike or Require a More Definite Statement of Affirmative Defenses and Portions of Answer (Brown, Michael)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and to Strike or Require a More Definite Statement of Affirmative Defenses and Portions of Answer, filed by Plaintiff Docklight Brands Inc. Noting Date 3/11/2022, (Brown, Michael)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/25/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/11/2022, Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2022. (KMP)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO PARTIES: Pursuant to Section II(G) of Judge Lin's Standing Order for All Civil Cases and Defendants' answer now having been filed, the Court hereby STRIKES as moot #2 the Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint. (KMP)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Docklight Brands Inc by High Park Holdings Ltd, Tilray Inc.(Cobb, Alicia)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rachel Epstein for Defendants High Park Holdings Ltd and Tilray Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rachel E. Epstein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants High Park Holdings Ltd, Tilray Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7394829 (Cobb, Alicia)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Turning Point, Inc. for Docklight Brands Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Docklight Brands Inc (Brown, Michael)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court jury demand on file (ST)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/29/2021. (ST)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Tana Lin added. (ST)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants High Park Holdings, Ltd., Tilray Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(Cobb, Alicia)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tilray, Inc. for High Park Holdings, Ltd.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by High Park Holdings, Ltd., Tilray Inc. (Cobb, Alicia)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants High Park Holdings, Ltd., Tilray Inc.. Noting Date 12/21/2021, (Cobb, Alicia)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County, case number 21-2-14734-4; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7379181) Attorney Alicia Cobb added to party High Park Holdings, Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Cobb added to party Tilray Inc.(pty:dft), filed by High Park Holdings, Ltd., Tilray Inc. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Jury Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet )(Cobb, Alicia) Modified on 12/22/2021. Duplicate descriptions of attachments removed. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Docklight Brands Inc v. Tilray Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Docklight Brands Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Docklight Brands Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey M Thomas
Represented By: Mark A Wilner
Represented By: Michael P Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilray Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Park Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilray Inc
Represented By: Rachel Epstein
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Park Holdings Ltd
Represented By: Rachel Epstein
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?