Canyon Park Business Center Owners' Association et al v. Buttigieg et al
Plaintiff: Canyon Park Business Center Owners' Association
Defendant: Pete Buttigieg, United States Department of Transportation, Stephanie Pollack, Melinda Roberson, Federal Highway Administration, Washington Department of Transportation and The Federal Highway Administration
Debtor: Roger Millar
Case Number: 2:2021cv01694
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian C Kipnis on behalf of Defendants Pete Buttigieg, Stephanie Pollack, Melinda Roberson, The Federal Highway Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Kipnis, Brian)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, Defendants Roger Millar and Washington State Department of Transportation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Roger Millar, Washington Department of Transportation.(Huot, Matthew)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Ashley G. S. Farhner on behalf of Defendant Washington Department of Transportation. (Farhner, Ashley)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorney Ashley G. S. Farhner added for Roger Millar; per #9 Notice of Attorney Association. (MW)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew D. Huot on behalf of Defendant Washington Department of Transportation. (Huot, Matthew)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorney Yasmine L Tarhouni added for Roger Millar, Washington Department of Transportation; attorney Matthew D. Huot added for Roger Millar per #8 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in WA State Shoreline Hearings Board, case number(s) in other court SHB No. 21-006 ; filed by Plaintiff Canyon Park Business Center Owners' Association. (Johnson, Dale)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Canyon Park Business Center Owners' Association (Johnson, Dale)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorneys Lawrence, Stillwell, Amberson Dale Noel Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Canyon Park Business Center Owners' Association. (Johnson, Dale) Modified on 12/28/2021 to show correct attorneys (MET).
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Molly Lawrence, Jacob Stillwell, Sophia Elizabeth Amberson for Canyon Park Business Center Owners' Association added per #5 Notice of Appearance. (MET)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Counsel are directed to confer and to file a JOINT STATUS REPORT by 2/25/2022. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SR)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (JWC)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Pete Buttigieg, Roger Millar, Stephanie Pollack, Melinda Roberson, The Federal Highway Administration, United States Department of Transportation, Washington Department of Transportation (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons) (JWC)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Canyon Park Business Center Owners' Association must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/30/2021. (JWC)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (JWC)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against defendant(s) United States Department of Transportation, Washington Department of Transportation, Stephanie Pollack, Federal Highway Administration, Melinda Roberson, Roger Millar, Pete Buttigieg (Receipt # AWAWDC-7379746) Attorney Dale Noel Johnson added to party Canyon Park Business Center Owners' Association(pty:pla), filed by Canyon Park Business Center Owners' Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Department of Transportation, #3 Summons Pete Buttigieg, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, #5 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #6 Summons Stephanie Pollack, U.S. Department of Transportation, #7 Summons Melinda Roberson, Federal Highway Division, #8 Summons Roger Millar, WA State Department of Transportation, #9 Summons WA State Department of Transportation, #10 Summons Federal Highway Administration)(Johnson, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canyon Park Business Center Owners' Association et al v. Buttigieg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Roger Millar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canyon Park Business Center Owners' Association
Represented By: Jacob Stillwell
Represented By: Molly Lawrence
Represented By: Sophia Elizabeth Amberson
Represented By: Dale Noel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Buttigieg
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Transportation
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Pollack
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Roberson
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Department of Transportation
Represented By: Ashley G. S. Farhner
Represented By: Matthew D. Huot
Represented By: Yasmine L Tarhouni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Highway Administration
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?