Copple et al v. Arthur J Gallagher & Co et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Copple, Justin Ward, Jeremy Fischer and Thomas Jay Moriarty
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., City of Bellevue, Does 1-20, Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC and Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00116
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Andrew Nieland filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co re #38 MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadlines (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 30, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadlines, filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/8/2022, (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 30, 2022 Filing 37 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to Answer, filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co. Noting Date 3/30/2022, (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 25, 2022 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Andrew Nieland filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 25, 2022 Filing 35 REPLY, filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co, TO RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Transfer Case (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 25, 2022 Filing 34 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Copple, TO RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Remand (Emery, Timothy)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew E Nieland for Defendants Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, and Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 21, 2022 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Jonah O. Harrison filed by Defendant City of Bellevue re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Harrison, Jonah)
March 21, 2022 Filing 31 RESPONSE, by Defendant City of Bellevue, to #21 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harrison, Jonah)
March 21, 2022 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Jonah O. Harrison filed by Defendant City of Bellevue re #20 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Harrison, Jonah)
March 21, 2022 Filing 29 RESPONSE, by Defendant City of Bellevue, to #20 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harrison, Jonah)
March 21, 2022 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Andrew Nieland filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co re #20 MOTION to Remand (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 21, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co, to #20 MOTION to Remand . (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 21, 2022 Filing 26 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Matthew Copple, to #21 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Emery, Timothy)
March 14, 2022 Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew E. Nieland FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7471658 (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 7, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Jonah O. Harrison for Defendant City of Bellevue from 3/26/2022 - 4/8/2022. (Harrison, Jonah)
March 4, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #20 MOTION to Remand . Filed by Plaintiff Matthew Copple. Noting Date 3/25/2022, (Emery, Timothy)
March 3, 2022 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Andrew Nieland filed by Defendants Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Terwilliger, Molly)
March 3, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Defendants Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/25/2022, (Terwilliger, Molly)
March 3, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Matthew Copple. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy W. Emery, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/3/2022 3/25/2022. Re-noted for 3/25/2022 pursuant to #23 NOTICE re-noting MOTION to Remand (Emery, Timothy) Modified on 3/4/2022 (NAW).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting #18 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, and Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC's answer is due by 3/28/2022. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
February 25, 2022 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC. Noting Date 2/25/2022, (Terwilliger, Molly)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/16/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/30/2022, Joint Status Report due by 4/13/2022, by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
February 11, 2022 Filing 16 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Records)(Terwilliger, Molly)
February 10, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Jonah O. Harrison on behalf of Defendant City of Bellevue. (Harrison, Jonah)
February 10, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Denise L Ashbaugh on behalf of Defendant City of Bellevue. (Ashbaugh, Denise)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #12 Stipulated MOTION to extend deadline to answer or otherwise respond to complaint. Defendants shall file an answer or other responsive pleading no later than 2/25/2022. Authorized by Judge Lauren King.(MW)
February 8, 2022 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION and proposed order to extend deadline to answer or otherwise respond to complaint, filed by Defendants Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC. Noting Date 2/8/2022, (Terwilliger, Molly)
February 8, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Hathaway Burden and J. Chad Mitchell for Defendants Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC. (Mitchell, J.)
February 8, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Molly A Terwilliger on behalf of Defendants Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC. (Terwilliger, Molly)
February 7, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #6 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter: Modified on 2/7/2022 to strike deficiency re Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney. Attorney Hathaway Burden properly signed Notice of Appearance at docket #2 . (KB)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted federal court jury demand on file. (ST)
February 3, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s); Notice of Pendency of Other Action.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST) Modified on 2/7/2022 to strike deficiency re Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney (see docket #2 ) (KB).
February 3, 2022 Judge Lauren King added. (ST)
February 2, 2022 Attorney Hathaway Burden for Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, and Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC added; per #2 Notice of Appearance. (KB)
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Arthur J. Gallagher & Co, AJG Financial Services LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher Brokerage & Risk Management Lervices LLC for Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Mitchell, J.) Modified on 2/7/2022 to add additional corporate parents/affiliates named in disclosure statement (KB).
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Mitchell, J.)
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Matthew Copple (Reddy, Patrick)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney J. Chad Mitchell on behalf of Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Mitchell, J.)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-00237-9SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7425035), filed by Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Chad Mitchell)(Mitchell, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copple et al v. Arthur J Gallagher & Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Copple
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Ward
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Fischer
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jay Moriarty
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.
Represented By: Hathaway Burden
Represented By: J. Chad Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois)
Represented By: Hathaway Burden
Represented By: J. Chad Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC
Represented By: Hathaway Burden
Represented By: J. Chad Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Hathaway Burden
Represented By: J. Chad Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bellevue
Represented By: Chad R Barnes
Represented By: Cheryl A Zakrzewski
Represented By: Denise L Ashbaugh
Represented By: Jonah O. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J Gallagher & Co
Represented By: Andrew E Nieland
Represented By: Hathaway Burden
Represented By: J. Chad Mitchell
Represented By: Molly A Terwilliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois)
Represented By: Andrew E Nieland
Represented By: Hathaway Burden
Represented By: J. Chad Mitchell
Represented By: Molly A Terwilliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC
Represented By: Andrew E Nieland
Represented By: Hathaway Burden
Represented By: J. Chad Mitchell
Represented By: Molly A Terwilliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc
Represented By: Andrew E Nieland
Represented By: Hathaway Burden
Represented By: J. Chad Mitchell
Represented By: Molly A Terwilliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?