United States of America et al v. Cherokee General Corporation et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and SCI Infrastructure LLC
Defendant: Cherokee General Corporation and Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00299
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/31/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/13/2022, Joint Status Report due by 6/27/2022. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Brian M Guthrie for Plaintiffs SCI Infrastructure LLC, United States of America. (Marconi, Robert)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Blair Michael Russ on behalf of Defendants Cherokee General Corporation, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Russ, Blair)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by SCI Infrastructure LLC (Marconi, Robert)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/5/2022) (NAW).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Cherokee General Corporation, Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (JWC) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/14/2022) (JWC). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/14/2022) (JWC).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/21/2022. (JWC)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Cherokee General Corporation, Hartford Fire Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # SEA106709), filed by United States of America, SCI Infrastructure LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (JWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Cherokee General Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brian M Guthrie
Represented By: Robert S Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCI Infrastructure LLC
Represented By: Brian M Guthrie
Represented By: Robert S Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee General Corporation
Represented By: Blair Michael Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Blair Michael Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?